Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Eeskay NH, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Paul Simon Music, Coral Reefer Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Cyanide Publishing, House of Cash, Inc. and Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Defendant: Eeskay NH, Inc. and Kurt Mathias
Case Number: 1:2018cv01023
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/8/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
December 18, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form. Within 21 days of receiving this notice the plaintiff is responsible to consult with all parties and to electronically file this form advising all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or that consent is not unanimous.(kad)
December 17, 2018 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante is hereby CANCELLED. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (jb)
December 17, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Laplante recused. The new case designation is: 18-cv-1023-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(jb)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. Case to be reassigned to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
December 14, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2019 04:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 12/28/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Eeskay NH, Inc., Kurt Mathias.(Tamposi, Peter)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter N. Tamposi on behalf of Eeskay NH, Inc., Kurt Mathias Attorney Peter N. Tamposi added to party Eeskay NH, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter N. Tamposi added to party Kurt Mathias(pty:dft).(Tamposi, Peter)
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed as to Kurt Mathias by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 12/4/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sullivan, Todd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to Eeskay NH, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 12/4/2018. Answer Follow Up on 12/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sullivan, Todd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington, DC. (mc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 Summonses issued electronically as to Eeskay NH, Inc., Kurt Mathias. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
November 15, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 5, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1023-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 AO 121 by Broadcast Music, Inc.(Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 AO 121 by Broadcast Music, Inc.(Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 AO 121 by Broadcast Music, Inc.(Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sullivan, Todd)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1729129 filed by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 7.1 Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Appendix Song Schedule, #4 Appendix Summons Boston Billiard, #5 Appendix Summons Kurt Mathias)(Sullivan, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Eeskay NH, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Simon Music
Represented By: Todd A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Reefer Music
Represented By: Todd A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Todd A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanide Publishing
Represented By: Todd A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: House of Cash, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eeskay NH, Inc.
Represented By: Peter N. Tamposi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Mathias
Represented By: Peter N. Tamposi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?