Doe v. NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Meyers, New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division and NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner
Intervenor Plaintiff: Southern New Hampshire Medical Center, Frisbie Memorial Hospital, Cheshire Medical Center, Weeks Medical Center, New London Hospital, Upper Connecticut Valley Hospital, Valley Regional Hospital, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Elliot Hospital, New Hampshire Hospital Association, Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Littleton Hospital Association, Androscoggin Valley Hospital, Monadnock Community Hospital, Cottage Hospital, Speare Memorial Hospital, LRGHealthcare, Concord Hospital, Catholic Medical Center, HCA Health Services of New Hampshire and Huggins Hospital
Case Number: 1:2018cv01039
Filed: November 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Jeffrey Meyers Withdrawal of Assent to the Hospital's Motion to Intervene by NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner.(Galdieri (NHAG), Anthony)
January 7, 2019 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement by Weeks Medical Center disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 42 Disclosure Statement by Valley Regional Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement by Upper Connecticut Valley Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement by Speare Memorial Hospital disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement by Southern New Hampshire Medical Center disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement by New Hampshire Hospital Association disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement by Monadnock Community Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement by Littleton Hospital Association disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement by LRGHealthcare disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement by Huggins Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement by HCA Health Services of New Hampshire disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement by Frisbie Memorial Hospital disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement by Elliot Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement by Cottage Hospital disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement by Concord Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement by Catholic Medical Center disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement by Androscoggin Valley Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement by New London Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement by Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement by Cheshire Medical Center disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement by Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 22 Exhibit 4 to #21 Partially Assented to MOTION to Intervene as plaintiff by Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Androscoggin Valley Hospital, Catholic Medical Center, Cheshire Medical Center, Concord Hospital, Cottage Hospital, Elliot Hospital, Frisbie Memorial Hospital, HCA Health Services of New Hampshire, Huggins Hospital, LRGHealthcare, Littleton Hospital Association, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Monadnock Community Hospital.(Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 Partially Assented to MOTION to Intervene as plaintiff filed by New Hampshire Hospital Association, Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Androscoggin Valley Hospital, Catholic Medical Center, Cheshire Medical Center, Concord Hospital, Cottage Hospital, Elliot Hospital, Frisbie Memorial Hospital, HCA Health Services of New Hampshire, Huggins Hospital, Littleton Hospital Association, LRGHealthcare, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Monadnock Community Hospital, New London Hospital, Southern New Hampshire Medical Center, Speare Memorial Hospital, Upper Connecticut Valley Hospital, Valley Regional Hospital, Weeks Medical Center. Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party New Hampshire Hospital Association(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Androscoggin Valley Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Catholic Medical Center(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Cheshire Medical Center(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Concord Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Cottage Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Elliot Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Frisbie Memorial Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party HCA Health Services of New Hampshire(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Huggins Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Littleton Hospital Association(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party LRGHealthcare(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Monadnock Community Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party New London Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Southern New Hampshire Medical Center(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Speare Memorial Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Upper Connecticut Valley Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Valley Regional Hospital(pty:intvp), Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Weeks Medical Center(pty:intvp). Follow up on Objection on 1/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Ramsdell, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Southern New Hampshire Medical Center. Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell added to party Southern New Hampshire Medical Center(pty:dft). Follow up on Objection on 1/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Ramsdell, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Heather Dunion Neville on behalf of New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division(Neville, Heather)
January 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Scott Edward Sakowski on behalf of New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division(Sakowski, Scott)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE for Anthony J. Galdieri to Withdraw as Attorney for New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division filed by New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division.(Galdieri (NHAG), Anthony) Modified on 1/4/2019 to change Motion to Notice and remove follow up ddl.(de).
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelvin A. Brooks on behalf of New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division Attorney Kelvin A. Brooks added to party New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division(pty:dft).(Brooks, Kelvin)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re #3 Motion to Certify Class to 01/12/2019. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #3 MOTION to Certify Class to 01/12/2019 filed by NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division.(Sakowski, Scott)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Dunion Neville on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division Attorney Heather Dunion Neville added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Dunion Neville added to party New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division(pty:dft).(Neville, Heather)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Edward Sakowski on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division Attorney Scott Edward Sakowski added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Edward Sakowski added to party New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division(pty:dft).(Sakowski, Scott)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division(pty:dft).(Galdieri (NHAG), Anthony)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #3 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiff John Doe filed by John Doe(Bissonnette, Gilles)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division by John Doe. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Southern New Hampshire Medical Center by John Doe. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner by John Doe. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Summonses issued electronically as to NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division, Southern New Hampshire Medical Center. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ///NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Count IV (Without Prejudice) by John Doe(Bissonnette, Gilles) Modified on 11/15/2018 to add: ///(js).
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Klementowicz on behalf of John Doe Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party John Doe(pty:pla).(Klementowicz, Henry)
November 13, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re: #2 MOTION TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE USING A PSEUDONYM. Text of Order: As soon as defendant appears in the case, the court shall schedule a hearing on the motion to occur on an expedited basis. Until such time as the court rules on the motion, plaintiff is granted permission to use a pseudonym. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 Addendum/ to #1 Complaint - New Case,, Revised Civil Action Cover Sheet by John Doe. (Bissonnette, Gilles)
November 10, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1039-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class filed by John Doe. Follow up on Objection on 11/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Gilles Bissonnette Esq.)(Bissonnette, Gilles)
November 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE USING A PSEUDONYM filed by John Doe. Follow up on Objection on 11/26/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
November 10, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1731928 filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- July 2018 NAMI Data, #2 Exhibit B -- Sept 6 2018 Merrimack Decision, #3 Exhibit C -- Nov. 17, 2017 Circuit Court Order, #4 Exhibit D -- Aug. 9, 2018 Merrimack Decision, #5 Exhibit E - -Circuit Court Supplemental Order, #6 Exhibit F - HB400, #7 Exhibit G -- AG 12.6.16 Brief, #8 Exhibit H -- Supreme Court Order, #9 Exhibit I - -IEA Hearing Plan from AUg. 31, 2017, #10 Exhibit J -- 12/17 IEA Report, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons - Waiver DHHS, #13 Summons - Waiver SNHMC, #14 Summons - Waiver Circuit Court)(Bissonnette, Gilles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #15 CORRECTED Summons) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Southern New Hampshire Medical Center
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Frisbie Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cheshire Medical Center
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Weeks Medical Center
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: New London Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Upper Connecticut Valley Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Valley Regional Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Elliot Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: New Hampshire Hospital Association
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Littleton Hospital Association
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Androscoggin Valley Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Monadnock Community Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Cottage Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Speare Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: LRGHealthcare
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Concord Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Catholic Medical Center
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: HCA Health Services of New Hampshire
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Huggins Hospital
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division
Represented By: Kelvin A. Brooks
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Represented By: Heather Dunion Neville
Represented By: Scott Edward Sakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Represented By: Heather Dunion Neville
Represented By: Scott Edward Sakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?