Smithe v. Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michelle Smithe
Defendant: Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01095
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 12/20/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 1/3/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 1/22/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lml)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #7 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-4 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial set for 1/22/2020. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/15/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 6/10/2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/23/2019. Discovery deadline 9/23/2019. (lml)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan Joint filed by Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc.. (Bouchard, Brian)
December 11, 2018 FILED IN ERROR - see previous Notice - NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 12/28/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml) Modified on 12/11/2018 to add filed in error text (lml).
December 10, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 12/28/2018. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand and Statement of Affirmative Defenses filed by Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc..(Bouchard, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2018-cv-00860, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Bouchard, Brian)
November 29, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
November 28, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1095-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Cole on behalf of Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc. Attorney Christopher Cole added to party Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc.(pty:dft).(Cole, Christopher)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian J. Bouchard on behalf of Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc. (Bouchard, Brian)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Bouchard, Brian)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough (Northern) Superior Court, case number 216-2018-cv-00860 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1738069) filed by Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 12/19/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #3 Notice of Removal to Counsel, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bouchard, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smithe v. Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easter Seals New Hampshire, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Bouchard
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Smithe
Represented By: Sean Robert List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?