Macdonald v. Strafford County Superior Court et al
Plaintiff: Peter Macdonald
Defendant: Strafford County Superior Court, Tina Nadeau, Lee, NH, Town of and Mark E. Howard
Case Number: 1:2018cv01100
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE/Answer to Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay filed by Peter Macdonald. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter and envelope)(jb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #11 MOTION Objection for Defendants motion to delay and Motion for Summary Judgment for lack of response by Defendants in this case filed by Mark E. Howard, Lee, NH, Town of, Tina Nadeau, Strafford County Superior Court. Follow up on Reply on 1/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Smith, Nancy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay filed by Mark E. Howard, Lee, NH, Town of, Tina Nadeau, Strafford County Superior Court. Follow up on Objection on 1/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Belobrow, Corey)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION/Objection for Defendants motion to delay and Motion for Summary Judgment for lack of response by Defendants in this case filed by Peter Macdonald. Follow up on Objection on 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Editor "Revenge" from Peter Macdonald re: cc to Court (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Peter Macdonald. Follow up on Objection on 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope)(jb)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Peter Macdonald. (cmp)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/Answer to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Peter Macdonald. (cmp)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lee, NH, Town of. Attorney Corey M. Belobrow added to party Lee, NH, Town of(pty:dft). Follow up on Objection on 1/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit Stipulated Judgment, #3 Exhibit Order on Motions, #4 Exhibit Macdonald's Motion-Appeal, #5 Exhibit NH Supreme Court Order, #6 Exhibit Summons ZBA Appeal, #7 Exhibit Order Dismissing Damages, #8 Exhibit Final Order, #9 Exhibit Verified Ex Parte Petition, #10 Exhibit Order Post Decision Motions, #11 Exhibit Order Plaintiffs Motion to Void, #12 Exhibit Order Granting Sheriff's Sale, #13 Exhibit Order denying Plaintiff Relief)(Belobrow, Corey)
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mark E. Howard, Tina Nadeau, Strafford County Superior Court. Attorney Nancy J. Smith added to party Mark E. Howard(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy J. Smith added to party Tina Nadeau(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy J. Smith added to party Strafford County Superior Court(pty:dft). Follow up on Objection on 1/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Smith, Nancy)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of decision wrongs, court errors and motion to dismiss case with damages awarded filed by Peter Macdonald. Follow up on Objection on 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 12/10/18 Notice of Decision, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(jb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Returns of Service Executed on 12/10/2018 as to Mark E. Howard, Lee, NH, Town of, Tina Nadeau, Strafford County Superior Court by Peter Macdonald. (jb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to Mark E. Howard, Lee, NH, Town of, Tina Nadeau, Strafford County Superior Court. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 29, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1100-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark E. Howard, Lee, NH, Town of, Tina Nadeau, Strafford County Superior Court with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14649017149) filed by Peter Macdonald. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summonses)(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macdonald v. Strafford County Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County Superior Court
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Nadeau
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee, NH, Town of
Represented By: Corey M. Belobrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Howard
Represented By: Nancy J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?