Doyon v. Porter

Plaintiff: David W Doyon and David W. Doyon
Defendant: Joel R Porter, Jr and Joel R. Porter, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01128
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 2/21/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
January 18, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #8 Assented to MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference filed by Joel R. Porter, Jr. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1473.(ko)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference filed by Joel R. Porter, Jr. Follow up on Objection on 1/31/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Shepard, Robert)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan due by 2/14/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Attorney Robert M. Shepard ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, Replaces document no. 4 filed by Joel R. Porter, Jr.(Shepard, Robert)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #5 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Joel R. Porter, Jr. The login and password used must equal the /s/ name on the pleading. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #4 Answer to Complaint filed by Joel R. Porter, Jr. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a) and Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing shall have a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. Filer shall refile and add to docket text Replaces document no. 4. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 1/18/2019.(ko)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M. Shepard on behalf of Joel R. Porter, Jr Attorney Robert M. Shepard (Shepard, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M. Shepard on behalf of Joel R. Porter, Jr Attorney Tanya L. Spony (Shepard, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Joel R. Porter, Jr.(Shepard, Robert)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Joel R. Porter, Jr by David W. Doyon. Served/Mailed on 12/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Myskowski, Jan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Joel R. Porter, Jr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
December 14, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1128-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1742164 filed by David W Doyon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Last Will of Bernadette A. Porter, #2 Exhibit B: May 9, 2018 Attorney Sheehan Letter, #3 Exhibit C: New Hampshire Quitclaim Deed, #4 Exhibit D: Florida Quitclaim Deed, #5 Exhibit E: May 21, 2018 Attorney Sheehan Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Myskowski, Jan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyon v. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W Doyon
Represented By: Jan P. Myskowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Doyon
Represented By: Jan P. Myskowski
Represented By: Marla Bellerive Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel R Porter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel R. Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M. Shepard
Represented By: Tanya L. Spony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?