RW IP Holdings, LLC v. Suki Holdings LLC et al

Plaintiff: RW IP Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Suki LLC, Suki Holdings LLC, Brian Dunham, Suzanne F Dunham and Suzanne F. Dunham
Case Number: 1:2018cv01131
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Suki Holdings LLC by RW IP Holdings, LLC. Served/Mailed on 1/14/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Nicosia, Peter)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Suki LLC by RW IP Holdings, LLC. Served/Mailed on 1/14/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Nicosia, Peter)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Suzanne F. Dunham by RW IP Holdings, LLC. Served/Mailed on 1/14/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Nicosia, Peter)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brian Dunham by RW IP Holdings, LLC. Served/Mailed on 1/14/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Nicosia, Peter)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Summonses and Waivers issued electronically as to Brian Dunham, Suzanne F. Dunham, Suki Holdings LLC, Suki LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(bt)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR- REPLACED BY DOC #6 - Summonses and Waivers issued electronically as to Brian Dunham, Suzanne F. Dunham, Suki Holdings LLC, Suki LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(bt) Modified on 12/17/2018 to add: **FILED IN ERROR- REPLACED BY DOC 6
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC.(mc)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (mc)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1131-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by RW IP Holdings, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Nicosia, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #1 CORRECTED Disclosure Statement) (bt).
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1742775 filed by RW IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: U.S. Patent No. 6,028,531, #2 Exhibit B: OhMiBod Terms and Conditions, #3 Exhibit C: Archived screenshots of Defendants advertising, #4 Exhibit D: Archived depictions of Defendants products, #5 Exhibit E: Claim chart for the accused products, #6 Exhibit F: Archived screenshots re Defendants company, #7 Exhibit G: Description article re Defendants founders, #8 Exhibit H: Defendants Indiegogo campaign, #9 Exhibit I: 10/24/2016 Infringement notification, #10 Exhibit J: 12/12/2016 Infringement notification, #11 Exhibit K: 10/17/2017 Infringement notification, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Patent Report Form)(Nicosia, Peter) Modified on 12/10/2018 to add: exhibit descriptions (ej). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2018: #14 CORRECTED complaint, #15 Notice of Lawsuit Brian Dunham, #16 Notice of Lawsuit Suki Holdings LLC, #17 Notice of Lawsuit Suki LLC, #18 Notice of Lawsuit Suzanne Dunham, #19 Summons Brian Dunham, #20 Summons Suki Holdings LLC, #21 Summons Suki LLC, #22 Summons Suzanne Dunham, #23 Waiver Brian Dunham, #24 Waiver Suki Holdings LLC, #25 Waiver Suki LLC, #26 Waiver Suzanne Dunham) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RW IP Holdings, LLC v. Suki Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suki LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suki Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne F Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne F. Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RW IP Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Nicosia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?