Veth v. US Attorney General, Acting et al

Plaintiff: ICE Acting Director Ronald D Vitiello and Saveth Veth
Respondent: Christopher Brackett, Matt Whitaker, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd Thurlow, Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent, US Attorney General, Acting, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary and Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director
Case Number: 1:2018cv01139
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director, US Attorney General, Acting Served/Mailed on 12/26/2018. (lml)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #8 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and dismissal of Petition for Habeas Corpus Relief, Endorsed Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (lml)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #7 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Text of Order: Denied. See Order (document no. 8) entered contemporaneously. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lml)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Mr. Veth's Petition for Habeas Corpus Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (document no. 1) is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction and his #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is necessarily denied. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in accordance with this order and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lml)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Saveth Veth. Follow up on Objection on 12/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(Haskell, Louis)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Objection to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director, Todd Thurlow, US Attorney General, Acting, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Alan Greenbaum)(McCormack, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Petitioner's Removal from the United States by Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director, Todd Thurlow, US Attorney General, Acting, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary. Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director(pty:res), Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party Todd Thurlow(pty:res), Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party US Attorney General, Acting(pty:res), Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary(pty:res).(McCormack, Michael)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support of Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and Writ of Habeas Corpus by Saveth Veth (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Certificate of Service to Memorandum)(Haskell, Louis)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/11/2018 re: #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Court issued Oral Order: the Court orders the defendants not to remove the petitioner from the United States without first providing 48 hours' notice of their intention to do so. Petitioner to file a memorandum with the Court by COB 12/12/2018; government to file responsive brief no later than 24 hours from petitioner's filing as set forth by Judge Barbadoro during the telephone conference. (Court Reporter: Liza Dubois) (Pltfs Atty: Louis Haskell) (Defts Atty: David Plourde, Michael McCormack)(Total Hearing Time: 43 minutes) (lml)
December 11, 2018 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies to US Marshal as to Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent per #3 Order Directing Service.(lml)
December 11, 2018 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to Acting Director, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Washington, DC; Assistant Director, ICE Boston Field Office, Burlington, MA; Acting US Attorney General, Washington, DC; US Attorney for the District of NH, and US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary per #3 Order Directing Service. (jbw)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lml)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1139-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(mc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Saveth Veth. Follow up on Objection on 12/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Service)(Haskell, Louis)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1743692.) filed by Saveth Veth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit MA CORI, #3 Exhibit Middlesex Superior Court Dockets, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel)(Haskell, Louis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: #5 Electronic Signature Petition, #6 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Corrected Exhibit MA CORI) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veth v. US Attorney General, Acting et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matt Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Thurlow
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General, Acting
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Director
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICE Acting Director Ronald D Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saveth Veth
Represented By: Louis S. Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?