Vongboupha v. Flores
Plaintiff: William Vongboupha
Defendant: Matthew A Flores
Case Number: 1:2018cv01154
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with jury demand filed by Matthew A Flores.(Darling, Mark)
January 16, 2019 Deadline terminated: Pretrial Conference 01/23/2019 cancelled. Order to issue. (de)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew A Flores with jury demand filed by William Vongboupha.(Nixon, Leslie)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion to Amend using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2019.(gla)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Matthew A Flores. (Darling, Mark)
January 15, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/16/2019.(de)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Amend filed by William Vongboupha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Nixon, Leslie)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2018-CV-935, Rockingham County Superior Court(Darling, Mark)
December 21, 2018 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 1/14/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ej)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1154-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Matthew A Flores.(Darling, Mark)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham Superior Court, case number 218-2018-CV-00935 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1745141) filed by Matthew Flores. Answer Follow Up on 1/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service, #3 Notice of Filing Removal, #4 Letter of Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Darling, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vongboupha v. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A Flores
Represented By: Mark A. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Vongboupha
Represented By: Leslie C. Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?