Frese v. NH Attorney General
Plaintiff: Robert Frese
Defendant: NH Attorney General Gordon MacDonald and NH Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2018cv01180
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to March 20, 2019 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 3/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to March 20, 2019 filed by NH Attorney General.(Edelman (NHAG), Lawrence)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Edelman (NHAG) on behalf of NH Attorney General Attorney Lawrence Edelman (NHAG) added to party NH Attorney General(pty:dft).(Edelman (NHAG), Lawrence)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Emerson J. Sykes complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 1/22/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Brian M. Hauss complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 1/22/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Emerson Sykes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1755087.) filed by Robert Frese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Emerson J. Sykes)(Klementowicz, Henry)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Brian Hauss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1755082.) filed by Robert Frese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Brian M. Hauss)(Klementowicz, Henry)
December 21, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NH Attorney General by Robert Frese. Served/Mailed on 12/18/2018. Answer Follow Up on 2/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Greabe on behalf of Robert Frese Attorney John M Greabe added to party Robert Frese(pty:pla).(Greabe, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #1 CORRECTED Notice of Appearance) (bt).
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1180-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Klementowicz on behalf of Robert Frese Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Robert Frese(pty:pla).(Klementowicz, Henry)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence A. Vogelman on behalf of Robert Frese Attorney Lawrence A. Vogelman added to party Robert Frese(pty:pla).(Vogelman, Lawrence)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1746963 filed by Robert Frese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Courts Chapter 91-A Response, #2 Exhibit B -- Frese 2012 Hudson Charge, #3 Exhibit C -- Frese 2018 Exeter Charge (Part 1), #4 Exhibit C -- Frese 2018 Exeter Charge (Part 2), #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Waiver)(Bissonnette, Gilles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frese v. NH Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Frese
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Brian M. Hauss
Represented By: Emerson J. Sykes
Represented By: John M Greabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Attorney General Gordon MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Attorney General
Represented By: Lawrence Edelman (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?