Spencer et al v. NH State Police et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Bros. LLC and William Spencer
Defendant: Lisa Wolford, Christopher Grey, Michael Doran, Cynthia Campise, US Department of Transportation, William Burke, Todd Damiani, Richard Tracy, Federal Motor Carriers Saftey Administration, NH State Police, NH Attorney General's Office, Douglas Wood, David Hilts, Kenneth Chaput, Steve Piwowarski and Steven Kace
Case Number: 1:2018cv01191
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The court ordered plaintiff Spencer Bros. LLC to have counsel file an appearance on its behalf on or before February 4, 2019. To date, no attorney has filed an appearance on behalf of Spencer Bros. LLC in this matter. Because plaintiff is not presently represented by counsel, in an abundance of caution, the court, sua sponte, extends the deadline by which Spencer Bros. LLC must have counsel file an appearance on its behalf until March 8, 2019. No further extensions of that deadline will be granted without good cause shown. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Steven Kace by William Spencer. Served/Mailed on 12/26/2018. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(de)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to William Burke, Kenneth Chaput, Michael Doran, Christopher Grey, David Hilts, NH Attorney General's Office, NH State Police, Steve Piwowarski, Richard Tracy, Lisa Wolford, Douglas Wood by William Spencer. Served/Mailed on 1/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 1/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(de)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time. Text of Order: Plaintiff Spencer Bros. LLC's motion (Doc. No. 6) for a fifteen day extension to have counsel file an appearance on its behalf is GRANTED. Counsel must file an appearance on behalf of Spencer Bros. LLC within fifteen days of the date of this notice or this matter will be referred to a judicial officer for the imposition of an appropriate sanction pursuant to LR 1.3(a). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #2 Motion to waive LR 83.6(c). Text of Order: Plaintiffs's motion to waive LR 83.6(c) (Doc. No. 2), so that plaintiff Spencer Bros. LLC can appear pro se, is DENIED. See Rowland v. Cal. Men's Colony, Unit II Men's Advisory Council, 506 U.S. 194, 201-02 (1993) ("It has been the law for the better part of two centuries... that a corporation may appear in the federal courts only through licensed counsel."). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(de)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William Burke, Kenneth Chaput, Michael Doran, David Hilts, Steven Kace, NH Attorney General's Office, NH State Police, Richard Tracy, Lisa Wolford. Follow up on Objection on 1/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law support of motion to dismiss, #2 Exhibit prehearing order)(Wilson, Christina)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina M. Wilson on behalf of William Burke, Kenneth Chaput, Michael Doran, David Hilts, Steven Kace, NH Attorney General's Office, NH State Police, Richard Tracy, Lisa Wolford Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party William Burke(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party Kenneth Chaput(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party Michael Doran(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party David Hilts(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party Steven Kace(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party NH Attorney General's Office(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party NH State Police(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party Richard Tracy(pty:dft), Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party Lisa Wolford(pty:dft).(Wilson, Christina)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison B. Greenstein on behalf of William Burke, Kenneth Chaput, Michael Doran, David Hilts, Steven Kace, NH Attorney General's Office, NH State Police, Richard Tracy, Lisa Wolford Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party William Burke(pty:dft), Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party Kenneth Chaput(pty:dft), Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party Michael Doran(pty:dft), Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party David Hilts(pty:dft), Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party Steven Kace(pty:dft), Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party NH Attorney General's Office(pty:dft), Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party NH State Police(pty:dft), Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party Richard Tracy(pty:dft), Attorney Allison B. Greenstein added to party Lisa Wolford(pty:dft).(Greenstein, Allison)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Deadline for Counsel to Appear for Spencer Bros. LLC for 15 days filed by Spencer Bros. LLC.(de)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Spencer Bros. LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (js)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Local Rule 83.6(c), a corporation, unincorporated association, or trust may not appear in any action pro se, re: #1 Complaint. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 1/10/2019. (bt)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Spencer Bros. LLC, William Spencer. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Spencer Bros. LLC shall file a disclosure statement by 12/28/2018. Disclosure Statement due 12/28/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(bt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses issued by mail as to William Burke, Cynthia Campise, Kenneth Chaput, Todd Damiani, Michael Doran, Federal Motor Carriers Saftey Administration, Christopher Grey, David Hilts, Steven Kace, NH Attorney General's Office, NH State Police, Steve Piwowarski, Richard Tracy, US Department of Transportation, Lisa Wolford, Douglas Wood. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
December 19, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1191-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Exemption to Court Rule 83.6 filed by William Spencer, Spencer Bros. LLC.(bt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Burke, Cynthia Campise, Kenneth Chaput, Todd Damiani, Michael Doran, Federal Motor Carriers Saftey Administration, Christopher Grey, David Hilts, Steven Kace, NH Attorney General's Office, NH State Police, Steve Piwowarski, Richard Tracy, US Department of Transportation, Lisa Wolford, Douglas Wood with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14649017232) filed by Spencer Bros. LLC, William Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Summonses)(bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer et al v. NH State Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Wolford
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Doran
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Campise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Burke
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Damiani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Tracy
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Motor Carriers Saftey Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Police
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hilts
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Chaput
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Piwowarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kace
Represented By: Christina M. Wilson
Represented By: Allison B. Greenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Bros. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?