United States Fire Insurance Company et al v. Equitas Insurance Limited et al

Plaintiff: North River Insurance Company and United States Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Tenecom Limited, Sompo Holdings, Inc., Equitas Insurance Limited, Banco de Seguros del Estado, Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, American Home Assurance Company, Ageas Insurance Limited and Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01205
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & Amended Complaint as to American Home Assurance Company filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 2/13/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Henlin, Alexander)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
February 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Law Firm Name Change (relative to Attorneys Catherine Isely and Andrew Shapiro) by North River Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company.(Henlin, Alexander)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 ///NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Ageas Insurance Limited by United States Fire Insurance Company and The North River Insurance Company (Henlin, Alexander) Modified on 2/7/2019 to add: The North River Insurance Company (de). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add: ///(js).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Andrew D. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Andrew D. Shapiro submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(gla)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Catherine E. Isely to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Catherine E. Isely submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(gla)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 12/31/2018. Answer Follow Up on 3/4/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Henlin, Alexander)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tenecom Limited by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 12/31/2018. Answer Follow Up on 4/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Henlin, Alexander)
January 28, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Equitas Insurance Limited by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 12/31/2018. Answer Follow Up on 4/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Henlin, Alexander)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Partially Assented to MOTION for Andrew D. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1760252.) filed by North River Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Andrew D. Shapiro, Esq. in Support of Motion)(Henlin, Alexander)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 Partially Assented to MOTION for Catherine E. Isely to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1760242.) filed by North River Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company. Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Catherine Isely, Esq. in Support of Motion)(Henlin, Alexander)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by North River Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Henlin, Alexander)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Ageas Insurance Limited, Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, American Home Assurance Company, Banco de Seguros del Estado, Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Ltd. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver (Updated) to American Home, #2 Summons - Waiver (Updated) to Allianz Suisse, #3 Summons - Waiver (Updated) to Delta-Lloyd, #4 Summons - Waiver (Updated) to Banco de Seguros del Estado, #5 Summons - Waiver (Updated) to Ageas Ins. Ltd.)(Henlin, Alexander)
January 10, 2019 Filing 9 Summons issued electronically as to American Home Assurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summonses issued electronically as to Ageas Insurance Limited, Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, Banco de Seguros del Estado, Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Ltd.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver to Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Ltd., #2 Summons - Waiver to Banco de Seguros del Estado, #3 Summons - Waiver to Allianz Suisse etc., #4 Summons - Waiver to Ageas Insurance Limited)(Henlin, Alexander)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Ageas Insurance Limited, Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft, American Home Assurance Company, Banco de Seguros del Estado, Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Ltd. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand filed by United States Fire Insurance Company, North River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver to Ageas Insurance Limited, #2 Summons - Waiver to Allianz Suisse, #3 Summons - Waiver to American Home Assurance Company, #4 Summons - Waiver to Banco de Seguros del Estado, #5 Summons - Waiver to Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Ltd.)(Henlin, Alexander)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Kevin M. Fitzgerald on behalf of North River Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company(Fitzgerald, Kevin)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander G. Henlin on behalf of North River Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company Attorney Alexander G. Henlin added to party North River Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Alexander G. Henlin added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Henlin, Alexander)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Equitas Insurance Limited, Sompo Holdings, Inc., Tenecom Limited. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
December 21, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by North River Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. United States Fire Insurance Company & North River Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by January 14, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 1/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(bt)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1205-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1749043 filed by United States Fire Insurance Company, North River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver, #5 Summons - Waiver)(Fitzgerald, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Fire Insurance Company et al v. Equitas Insurance Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North River Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin M. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Catherine E. Isely
Represented By: Andrew D. Shapiro
Represented By: Alexander G. Henlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin M. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Catherine E. Isely
Represented By: Andrew D. Shapiro
Represented By: Alexander G. Henlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenecom Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sompo Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitas Insurance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco de Seguros del Estado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Suisse Versicherungs-Gesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ageas Insurance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta-Lloyd Non-Life Insurance Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?