Karpinski et al v. Union Leader Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Olivia Karpinski and Paul Edalat
Defendant: Trent E. Spiner, Patricia J. Grossmith and Union Leader Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01214
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. MOTION HEARING held on 4/23/2019 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Liza Dubois) (Pltfs Atty: Joshua M. Wyatt; Matthew R. Johnson) (Defts Atty: Gregory V. Sullivan)(Total Hearing Time: 2 hours 10 minutes) (js)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 SURREPLY to Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paul Edalat, Olivia Karpinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Hearing Transcript)(Wyatt, Joshua)
March 25, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 6/2/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. JERS Statement due 5/4/2020. Pretrial Statements due 5/4/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 5/18/2020.(js)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving with changes #9 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 6 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 2/3/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/15/2019. Discovery deadline 1/6/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 10/28/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 9/1/2019.(js)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Union Leader Corporation. Surreply due by 3/25/2019. (Sullivan, Gregory)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 10:00 AM is cancelled. Order to issue. (js)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Paul Edalat, Olivia Karpinski. (Wyatt, Joshua)
March 13, 2019 NOTICE re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paul Edalat, Olivia Karpinski. Follow up on Reply on 3/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law ISO Objection to MTD, #2 Exhibit 1: Cahill Action Docket Report, #3 Exhibit 2: Cahill First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3: Cahill Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4: Denterlein Email Chain, #6 Exhibit 5: Union Leader Article, #7 Exhibit 6: Jury Instructions in Cahill Action, #8 Exhibit 7: Jury Verdict in Cahill Action)(Wyatt, Joshua)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/19/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
February 27, 2019 Corrective Entry to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Entry corrected by adding Patricia J. Grossmith and Trent Spiner as filers as they were not chosen at filing. (js)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Union Leader Corporation, Patricia J. Grossmith, Trent Spiner. Attorney Gregory V. Sullivan added to party Union Leader Corporation(pty:dft). HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 3/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Memorandum, #3 Exhibit Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Order, #5 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Sullivan, Gregory) Modified on 2/27/2019 to add: Patricia J. Grossmith and Trent Spiner as filers as they were not chosen at filing(js).
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua M. Wyatt on behalf of Paul Edalat, Olivia Karpinski Attorney Joshua M. Wyatt added to party Paul Edalat(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua M. Wyatt added to party Olivia Karpinski(pty:pla).(Wyatt, Joshua)
January 3, 2019 Corrective Entry to #4 Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance, Waiver of Service Executed. Entry corrected by Removing the following text from the entry as two events were selected at filing: "REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by All Plaintiffs" (js)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Trent E. Spiner by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 12/28/2018. Answer Follow Up on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Johnson, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Patricia J. Grossmith by All Plaintiffs. ( Served/Mailed on 12/28/2018., Answer Follow Up on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).)(Johnson, Matthew) Modified on 1/3/2019 to remove the following text as incorrect event used at filing: "REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by All Plaintiffs"(js).
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Union Leader Corporation by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 12/28/2018. Answer Follow Up on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Johnson, Matthew)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Patricia J. Grossmith, Trent E. Spiner, Union Leader Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ej)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
December 24, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1214-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1749746 filed by Olivia Karpinski, Paul Edalat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Farmelant Email Chain, #2 Exhibit 2 - Union Leader Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Verdict Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Press Release, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons - Waiver Union Leader Corporation, #7 Summons - Waiver Patricia J. Grossmith, #8 Summons - Waiver Trent E. Spiner). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Johnson, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karpinski et al v. Union Leader Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent E. Spiner
Represented By: Gregory V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia J. Grossmith
Represented By: Gregory V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Leader Corporation
Represented By: Gregory V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Karpinski
Represented By: Matthew R. Johnson
Represented By: Joshua M. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Edalat
Represented By: Matthew R. Johnson
Represented By: Joshua M. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?