Askenaizer v. Hiscox Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael S. Askenaizer
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company
Undetermined: US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2018cv01216
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Record) (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, dcs)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Text of Order: Granted So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 2/25/2019.(gla)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Joint Assented to Motion to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal or Other Appropriate Filing and Pro Hac Vice Motion to April 1, 2019. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Case Settlement Deadline 4/1/2019.(de)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal or Other Appropriate Filing and Pro Hac Vice Motion to April 1, 2019 filed by Hiscox Insurance Company.(Parent, Jennifer)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Hiscox Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Parent, Jennifer)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE re: #1 Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference, Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Hiscox Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by January 18, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 1/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(bt)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Christopher M. Dube, Esq. must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 1/28/2019.(bt)
December 28, 2018 Attorney Marc McDonald advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 1/28/2019. (de)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Alexis J. Rogoski, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.Compliance Deadline set for 1/25/2019.(mc)
December 26, 2018 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 26, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1216-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference. Transmitting Motion to Withdraw Reference and Report and Recommendation of Judge Bruce A. Harwood. Bankruptcy Court Case Number 18-1044., Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (US Bankruptcy Court - NH, dcsdcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Askenaizer v. Hiscox Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Askenaizer
Represented By: Edmond J. Ford
Represented By: Marc W. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Dube
Represented By: Alexis J. Rogoski
Represented By: Jennifer L. Parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?