Brown et al v. Adams Investments LLC et al

Plaintiff: Catherine E. Brown, Suzanne M. Brown, White Mountain Organic Growers' Association LLC and White Mountain Organic Growers' Assn LLC
Defendant: Cornerstone Capital Strategies, LLC, Scott Adams, Adams Investments LLC and Cornerstone Capital Strategies LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01218
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se Motion to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Catherine E. Brown. Served on 2/5/2019. Follow up on Objection on 2/25/2019. (ko)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE - Local Rule 83.6(c), a corporation, unincorporated association, or trust may not appear in any action pro se re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. Signed by Erica Jordan, Deputy Clerk.Compliance Deadline set for 2/7/2019.(ej)
January 17, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ej)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint filed by Scott Adams, Adams Investments LLC, Cornerstone Capital Strategies LLC.(Robinson, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 214-2018-CV-00150, COOS County Superior Court(Robinson, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1218-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Cornerstone Capital Strategies, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Robinson, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Adams Investments LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Robinson, Michael)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from COOS Superior Court, case number 214-2018-CV-00150 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1750274) filed by Cornerstone Capital Strategies, LLC, Adams Investments LLC, Scott Adams. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Adams Investments LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Capital Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Adams
Represented By: Michael P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Investments LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Capital Strategies LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Mountain Organic Growers' Association LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Mountain Organic Growers' Assn LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?