Belanger v. Hannaford Brothers Company LLC

Plaintiff: Linda Belanger
Defendant: Hannaford Bros. Co., LLC and Hannaford Brothers Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01223
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Judicial Settlement Conference (Joint) by Hannaford Brothers Company LLC.(O'Brien, Timothy)
February 5, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 3/30/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 4/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 5/5/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving (with changes) #9 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint). Length of Trial 3-5 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Motion to Remand (doc no. #6 ) is denied without prejudice as outlined. Parties to contact court re court-administered mediation by 2/15/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/30/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 7/15/2019. Mid-Litigation Discovery Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 10/16/2019. Discovery deadline 11/1/2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/10/2020. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/1/2019. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: David P. Slawsky) (Defts Atty: Timothy J. O'Brien)(Total Hearing Time: 24 minutes) (jb)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for February 1, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint) filed by Hannaford Brothers Company LLC. (O'Brien, Timothy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hannaford Brothers Company LLC. Follow up on Reply on 1/31/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy J. O'Brien)(O'Brien, Timothy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hannaford Brothers Company LLC. Follow up on Reply on 1/31/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (O'Brien, Timothy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Linda Belanger. Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law)(Slawsky, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 215-2018-cv-00386, Grafton County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Certified State Court Record)(O'Brien, Timothy)
January 7, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/25/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
January 3, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
December 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1223-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Hannaford Bros. Co., LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (O'Brien, Timothy)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Hannaford Bros. Co., LLC.(O'Brien, Timothy)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy J. O'Brien on behalf of Hannaford Bros. Co., LLC Attorney Timothy J. O'Brien added to party Hannaford Bros. Co., LLC(pty:dft).(O'Brien, Timothy)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from New Hampshire Superior Court, Grafton County, case number 215-2018-cv-386 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1750802) filed by Hannaford Bros. Co., LLC. Answer Follow Up on 1/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings and Process, #2 Exhibit Notice to State Court and Counsel of Notice of removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anne Cunningham, #5 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of David Slawsky)(Smith, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belanger v. Hannaford Brothers Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannaford Bros. Co., LLC
Represented By: Tyler Smith
Represented By: Timothy J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannaford Brothers Company LLC
Represented By: Tyler Smith
Represented By: Timothy J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Belanger
Represented By: David P. Slawsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?