Amatucci v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Josephine Amatucci
Defendant: Carroll County Sheriff's Department, Michael Bedley and Richard M. Young, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01227
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiffs request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(bt)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Add Another Defendant filed by Josephine Amatucci. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bt)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Josephine Amatucci. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(bt)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. New case number is 1:18-cv-1227-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs.Compliance Deadline set for 3/1/2019.(bt)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Supplement to Lawsuit re: #1 Complaint by Josephine Amatucci. (mc)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Bedley, Carroll County Sheriff's Department, Richard M. Young, Jr with Jury Demand filed by Josephine Amatucci.(bt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #1 Summons - Waiver) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amatucci v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Young, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Amatucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?