Colon Rodriguez v. Piedmont Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Colon Rodriguez
Defendant: Piedmont Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00011
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 2/19/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Pretrial Statements due 1/17/2020. JERS Statement due 1/17/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/22/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 1/31/2020. (kad)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving with changes #8 Discovery Plan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Ready for Trial on 2/19/2020. Case Track: Standard, 4 days. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/22/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 12/6/2019. Discovery deadline 10/31/2019. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 8/22/2019.(kad)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone cancelled. Order to issue. (kad)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Marks, Richard)
February 13, 2019 Clerk's Notice - Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/14/2019.(kad)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2018-CV-00914, Hillsborough Northern District County Superior Court(Marks, Richard)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/11/2019. (kad)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge and Consent Form by Jessica Colon Rodriguez.(Simoneau, Kirk)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. If no consent form has yet been filed, the plaintiff is required to file a consent on or before the date of filing an objection to this Motion. Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Marks, Richard)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Peter J. Petesch submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 1/22/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(bt)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties.(bt)
January 4, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-11-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Peter J. Petesch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1754075.) filed by Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 1/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Peter Petesch)(Marks, Richard)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Piedmont Airlines, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Marks, Richard)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of Northern District of Hillsborough, case number 216-2018-CV-00914 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1754061) filed by Piedmont Airlines, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 1/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #4 Civil Cover)(Marks, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon Rodriguez v. Piedmont Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Colon Rodriguez
Represented By: Kirk C. Simoneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piedmont Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Marks
Represented By: Peter J. Petesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?