Fraize v. School Administrative Unit 9 et al

Plaintiff: Kathleen Fraize
Defendant: Conway School District, SAU 9 and School Administrative Unit 9
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/11/2019. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Leslie H. Johnson) (Defts Atty: Dona Feeney)(Total Hearing Time: 22 minutes) (jb)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 11, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #7 Proposed Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Conway School District, School Administrative Unit 9. (Hilliard, Joshua)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 212-2019-CV-00002, Carroll County Superior Court(Hilliard, Joshua)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua S. Hilliard on behalf of Conway School District, School Administrative Unit 9 Attorney Joshua S. Hilliard added to party Conway School District(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua S. Hilliard added to party School Administrative Unit 9(pty:dft).(Hilliard, Joshua)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2019 03:30 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Joint Discovery Plan 3/4/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Conway School District, School Administrative Unit 9.(Feeney, Dona)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to February 19, 2019 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 2/19/2019. (jb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to February 19, 2019 filed by Conway School District, School Administrative Unit 9.(Feeney, Dona)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dona Feeney on behalf of Conway School District, School Administrative Unit 9 (Feeney, Dona)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
January 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-47-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Carroll County Superior Court, case number 212-2019-CV-00002 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1757282) filed by SAU 9, Conway School District. Answer Follow Up on 2/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice to Counsel, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feeney, Dona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraize v. School Administrative Unit 9 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway School District
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAU 9
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Administrative Unit 9
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fraize
Represented By: Leslie H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?