Doughty et al v. State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC

Plaintiff: Randy Severance and Patrick Doughty
Defendant: State Employees' Association of New Hampshire, Inc. and State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00053
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Assented to Motion for Ramya Ravindran to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Ramya Ravindran, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 3/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to Motion for Leon Dayan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Leon Dayan, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 3/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #11 MOTION for Ramya Ravindran to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #12 MOTION for Leon Dayan to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leon Dayan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1772468.) filed by State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC. Follow up on Objection on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Krupski, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Ramya Ravindran to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1772466.) filed by State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC. Follow up on Objection on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Krupski, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John S. Krupski on behalf of State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC (Krupski, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John S. Krupski on behalf of State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC Attorney John S. Krupski added to party State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC(pty:dft).(Krupski, John)
February 8, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #8 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, pleadings filed in an electronically converted PDF format shall contain a /s/ signature. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. (vln)
February 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DUPLICATE PAYMENT: State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC submitted a duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00, receipt no. 0102-1768994, re #7 Complaint - New Case. To request a refund, the filer shall complete the #Request for Refund Form available on the court's website and submit it to the clerk's office either via email or conventionally in paper.(vln)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Snyder on behalf of State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC (Snyder, Gary)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR. FILER USED INCORRECT EVENT.NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1768994 filed by State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC.(Snyder, Gary) Modified on 2/7/2019 to add:ERROR (vln).
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC by Patrick Doughty, Randy Severance. Served/Mailed on 1/29/2019. Answer Follow Up on 4/2/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Gould, Bryan)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Milton L. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Milton L. Chappell, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/1/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Alyssa K. Hazelwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Alyssa K. Hazelwood, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/1/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Frank D. Garrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Frank D. Garrison, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/1/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Milton L. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1759946.) filed by Patrick Doughty, Randy Severance. Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Milton L. Chappell)(Gould, Bryan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Alyssa K. Hazelwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1759945.) filed by Patrick Doughty, Randy Severance. Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Alyssa K. Hazelwood)(Gould, Bryan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Frank D. Garrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1759935.) filed by Patrick Doughty, Randy Severance. Follow up on Objection on 2/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Frank D. Garrison, #2 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment A, #3 Attachment to Exhibit Attachment B)(Gould, Bryan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons and Waiver issued electronically as to State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
January 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-53-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1757852 filed by Patrick Doughty, Randy Severance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver.)(Gould, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2019: #5 CORRECTED Notice of Lawsuit) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doughty et al v. State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Employees' Association of New Hampshire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Employee's Association of NH, SEIU, Local 1984, CTW, CLC
Represented By: John S. Krupski
Represented By: Leon Dayan
Represented By: Ramya Ravindran
Represented By: Gary Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Severance
Represented By: Bryan K. Gould
Represented By: Alyssa K. Hazelwood
Represented By: Frank D. Garrison
Represented By: Milton L. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Doughty
Represented By: Bryan K. Gould
Represented By: Alyssa K. Hazelwood
Represented By: Frank D. Garrison
Represented By: Milton L. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?