KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. v. US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of Revenue and US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
January 30, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (cmp)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Without Prejudice by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.(Anderson, Peter)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. : Joint Status Report(Anderson, Peter)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal Exhibits to Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2019. (Pltfs Atty: Jaqueline Botchman, Esq.) (Defts Atty: David Pourde, Esq.), Court Reporter: Liza Dubois) (Total Hearing Time: 25 minutes) (cmp)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Temp Restraining Order. IRS shall respond to the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by January 30, 2019. Defendants shall promptly notify the court if any levy against KSD is to issue. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Jacqueline A. Botchman must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 2/22/2019.(cmp)
January 25, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing re: #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temp Restraining Order. Telephone Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The court will initiate the call.(cmp)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION Seal Exhibits to Complaint filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc..(Anderson, Peter)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temp Restraining Order filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 2/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notices, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Form 433B, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Anderson, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019: #5 REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 1 -, #6 REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit 2) (cmp).
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Anderson, Peter)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter D. Anderson on behalf of KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. Attorney Botchman (Anderson, Peter)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
January 24, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
January 23, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by January 30, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 1/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
January 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-82-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1761677 filed by KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc..(Anderson, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #1 Affidavit of Beth Fowler, #2 Exhibit 1 Notices of Intent to Levy, #3 Exhibit 2 Form 433-B, #4 Redacted Exhibit 2, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc. v. US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KSD Custom Wood Products, Inc.
Represented By: Peter D. Anderson
Represented By: Jaqueline Anne Botchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?