O'malley v. Ocwen Loan Servicing

Plaintiff: Christine O'malley
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing
Case Number: 1:2019cv00084
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christine O'malley. Terminated Party Ocwen Loan Servicing. (Case Closed)(js)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE OF DUPLICATE PAYMENT: Ocwen Loan Servicing submitted a duplicate payment in the amount of 400, receipt no. 0102-1761894, re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. To request a refund, the filer shall complete the #Request for Refund Form available on the court's website and submit it to the clerk's office either via email or conventionally in paper.(ej)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ej)
January 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-84-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Farside, Joseph)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph A. Farside, Jr on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing (Farside, Joseph)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham Superior, case number 218-2019-CV-00089 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1761905) filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing. Answer Follow Up on 2/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint/Summons, #2 Notice of Removal State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A - Complaint, #5 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #6 Exhibit C - Assignment of Mortgage, #7 Exhibit D - Listing Agreement, #8 Exhibit E - Assessor's Record)(Farside, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'malley v. Ocwen Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine O'malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing
Represented By: Joseph A. Farside, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?