Cuchetti et al v. Broan-NuTone, LLC et al

Plaintiff: John Cuchetti and Joann Cuchetti
Defendant: NuTone, Inc., Broan-NuTone LLC and Broan-NuTone, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00108
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/17/2020 09:30 AM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2020 04:00 PM before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Pretrial Statements due 2/18/2020. JERS Statement due 2/18/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 3/3/2020. (js)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving with changes #5 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4-6 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/4/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 4/15/2019. Discovery deadline 1/15/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 11/6/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 12/1/2019.(js)
March 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING- Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 is CANCELLED. Order to issue. (js)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan Jointly filed by the parties filed by Broan-NuTone, LLC. (Black, Andrew)
March 12, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice.(js)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 212-2018-CV-00192, Carroll County Superior Court(Black, Andrew)
February 15, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No State Court Record Filed. State court record due within 14 days of this notice. (js)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 3/11/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Broan-NuTone, LLC.(Black, Andrew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Broan-NuTone, LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Black, Andrew)
January 31, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Broan-NuTone, LLC and NuTone, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Broan-NuTone, LLC and NuTone, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by February 7, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 2/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ej)
January 31, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ej)
January 29, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-108-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Carroll County Superior Court, case number 212-2018-CV-00192 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1764213) filed by Broan-NuTone LLC. Answer Follow Up on 2/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit 2, Notice to Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3, Letter to State Court Clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuchetti et al v. Broan-NuTone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cuchetti
Represented By: Gary M. Burt
Represented By: John Daniel Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Cuchetti
Represented By: Gary M. Burt
Represented By: John Daniel Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuTone, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-NuTone LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-NuTone, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?