Korat v. US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary et al
Plaintiff: Hiren Korat
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, US Department of Homeland Security, Robert Wilkies, US Department of Defense, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Manchester Field Office Director, US Department of Defense, Acting Secretary and US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary
Case Number: 1:2019cv00111
Filed: January 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Klementowicz on behalf of Hiren Korat Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Hiren Korat(pty:pla).(Klementowicz, Henry)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to February 22, 2019. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Complaint - New Case,, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to February 22, 2019 filed by US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Manchester Field Office Director, US Department of Defense, US Department of Defense, Acting Secretary, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, Robert Wilkies. Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Manchester Field Office Director(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Defense(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Defense, Acting Secretary(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary(pty:dft), Attorney Terry L. Ollila added to party Robert Wilkies(pty:dft).(Ollila, Terry)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Text of Order: Under review, pending a responsive pleading filed in due course under the FRCP. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of Hiren Korat Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Hiren Korat(pty:pla).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Manchester Field Office Director, US Department of Defense, US Department of Defense, Acting Secretary, US Department of Homeland Security, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, Robert Wilkies. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
January 31, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
January 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-111-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
January 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hiren Korat. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 2/14/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1 -- Naturalization Contract, #3 Exhibit 2 -- Letter from LTC Ernest, #4 Exhibit 3 -- Background Check Approval, #5 Exhibit 4 -- Background Investigation Report, #6 Exhibit 5 -- CI-Review, #7 Exhibit 6 -- CAF Report, #8 Exhibit 7 -- USCIS Biometrics, #9 Exhibit 8 -- Status Inquiries, #10 Exhibit 9 -- MSSD Unfavorable Letter, #11 Exhibit 10 -- Credit Report, #12 Exhibit 11 -- H1B Status, #13 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Hiren Korat, #14 Proposed Order)(Kim, SangYeob)
January 31, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1765444 filed by Hiren Korat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Naturalization Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Background Check Approval 3.6.17, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Waiver Nielsen, #5 Summons - Waiver Department of Homeland Security, #6 Summons - Waiver Cissa, #7 Summons - Waiver Riordan, #8 Summons - Waiver Rogers, #9 Summons - Waiver Shanahan, #10 Summons - Waiver Wilkies, #11 Summons - Waiver Department of Defense)(Kim, SangYeob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korat v. US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkies
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Defense
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Manchester Field Office Director
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Defense, Acting Secretary
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary
Represented By: Terry L. Ollila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiren Korat
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?