Dickey v. Riverbend Community Mental Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Dickey
Defendant: Riverbend Community Mental Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00133
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/17/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Pretrial Statements due 2/14/2020. JERS Statement due 2/14/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/15/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/28/2020. (kad)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving with changes #7 Discovery Plan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Ready for Trial on 3/17/2020. Length of Trial 3-5. Case Track: Standard. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/12/2019. Discovery deadline 12/13/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 12/13/2019.(kad)
March 12, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone cancelled. Order to issue. (kad)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Pandolph, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Riverbend Community Mental Health, Inc.. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Pandolph, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2019-CV-00015, Merrimack County Superior Court(Pandolph, William)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/6/2019. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Riverbend Community Mental Health, Inc..(Pandolph, William)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Israel Francisco Piedra on behalf of Paul Dickey Attorney Israel Francisco Piedra added to party Paul Dickey(pty:pla).(Piedra, Israel)
February 7, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties.(bt)
February 6, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-133-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Riverbend Community Mental Health, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Pandolph, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Merrimack Superior Court, case number 217-2019-CV-00015 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1768509) filed by Riverbend Community Mental Health, Inc. Answer Follow Up on 2/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pandolph, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickey v. Riverbend Community Mental Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dickey
Represented By: Jack S. White
Represented By: Israel Francisco Piedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverbend Community Mental Health, Inc.
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?