Tucker v. Checkr, Inc.

Plaintiff: Seth H. Tucker
Defendant: Checkr, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00169
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (js)
March 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Checkr, Inc, by Seth H. Tucker(Agruss, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Agruss on behalf of Seth H. Tucker (Agruss, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion for Michael S. Agruss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Michael S. Agruss, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 3/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Michael S. Agruss to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1775571.) filed by Seth H. Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(Fox, Rosanna) Modified on 2/22/2019 to remove the words " Assented to" -call from attorney's office stating motion was not assented to. (js).
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Checkr, Inc. by Seth H. Tucker. Served/Mailed on 2/19/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Fox, Rosanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Checkr, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(bt)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-169-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1772610 filed by Seth H. Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fox, Rosanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Checkr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth H. Tucker
Represented By: Rosanna T. Fox
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Checkr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?