NeoPollard Interactive LLC et al v. US Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Pollard Banknote Limited and NeoPollard Interactive LLC
Defendant: USA, US Attorney General and US Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv00170
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. 19-cv-163-PB and 19-cv-170-SM are consolidated into one case. 19-cv-170-SM is statistically closed. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas F. Casolaro on behalf of NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited Attorney Nicholas F. Casolaro added to party NeoPollard Interactive LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas F. Casolaro added to party Pollard Banknote Limited(pty:pla).(Casolaro, Nicholas)
February 22, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing. As this case is related to 19-cv-163-PB, the parties in 19-cv-170-SM are invited to participate in the telephone conference set for Friday, February 22, 2019 at 11:00 AM. The court will contact the parties with dial-in instructions. Telephone Conference set for 2/22/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (js)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven A Myers on behalf of US Attorney General, US Department of Justice, USA Attorney Steven A Myers added to party US Attorney General(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Myers added to party US Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Steven A Myers added to party USA(pty:dft).(Myers, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 Potential CONSOLIDATION Notice. Cases 19-cv-170-SM and 19-cv-163-PB reference each other as related cases and may be consolidated. Objections to Consolidation due 4/1/2019.(ej)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #8 Affidavit of Service, filed by NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603 226-7326.(lml)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Theodore B. Olson submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 3/1/2019. To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(ej)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint for Declaratory Relief as to All Defendants filed by NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited. Served/Mailed on 2/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 3/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Delaney, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(ej)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses issued electronically as to US Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ej)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
February 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-170-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Rule 57 Motion for Speedy Hearing filed by NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order)(Delaney, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 3/18/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) - Declaration of Liz Siver, #3 Exhibit (Affidavit) - Declaration of Douglas E. Pollard, #4 Exhibit (Affidavit) - Declaration of Michael A. Delaney, #5 Exhibit 1 to Delaney Decl. (2011 Opinion), #6 Exhibit 2 to Delaney Decl. (2018 Opinion), #7 Exhibit 3 to Delaney Decl. (Rosenstein Memo.), #8 Exhibit 4 to Delaney Decl. (Senate Hearings), #9 Exhibit 5 to Delaney Decl. (House Hearings))(Delaney, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Matthew D. McGill to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1772703.) filed by NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited. Follow up on Objection on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) - Affidavit of Matthew D. McGill)(Delaney, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Theodore B. Olson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1772686.) filed by NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited. Follow up on Objection on 3/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) - Affidavit of Theodore B. Olson)(Delaney, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Delaney, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1772677 filed by NeoPollard Interactive LLC, Pollard Banknote Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver (AG), #3 Summons - Waiver (US DOJ), #4 Summons - Waiver (US Atty - DNH))(Delaney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NeoPollard Interactive LLC et al v. US Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pollard Banknote Limited
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson
Represented By: Matthew D. McGill
Represented By: Michael A. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas F. Casolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NeoPollard Interactive LLC
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson
Represented By: Matthew D. McGill
Represented By: Michael A. Delaney
Represented By: Nicholas F. Casolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Justice
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?