Mezan v. US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary et al

Petitioner: Francis Wilson Mezan
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent and Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director
Case Number: 1:2019cv00198
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 US Marshal Service of Process re: service documents on Christopher Brackett, Superintendent.(jb)
March 7, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jb)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ///ORDER granting #6 Assented to MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Francis Wilson Mezan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed Stipulated Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice))(Bissonnette, Gilles)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to ICED Boston Field Office and AG of the United States.(jb)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Sarah Sherman-Stokes complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 3/11/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
February 27, 2019 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies hand delivered to Civil Division Chief for the United States Attorney's Office. Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to ICE Boston Field Office, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, and Attorney General of the United States. Copies to Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent per #5 Order Directing Service.(jb)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. The clerk to make delivery of the Petition and this Order to the United States Attorney for the District of New Hampshire. Clerk to send certified copies as outlined to ICE Boston Field Office, Secretary of Homeland Security and the United States Attorney General. Service upon Strafford County Department of Corrections to be effected by U.S. Marshals Service. Respondents shall file an answer or other response within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Respondents shall provide the court with at least 48 hours advance notice of any scheduled removal or transfer of petitioner out of this court's jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to immediately provide a copy of this order to the District of NH United States Attorney's Office Civil Bureau Chief. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Sarah Sherman-Stokes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1777195.) filed by Francis Wilson Mezan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Counsel)(Kim, SangYeob)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Klementowicz on behalf of Francis Wilson Mezan Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Francis Wilson Mezan(pty:pet).(Klementowicz, Henry)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of Francis Wilson Mezan Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Francis Wilson Mezan(pty:pet).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Sarah Sherman-Stokes, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty 30 days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 3/28/2019.(ej)
February 26, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-198-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
February 26, 2019 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (ej)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1776752.) filed by Francis Wilson Mezan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1_Notice of Revocation of Release, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2_2012 Removal and CAT Order, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3_11.17.11 Transcript - Designation of Country of Removal, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4_Denial of Motion to Reopen, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5_Emergency Stay Granted from IJ, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6_2011 Notice to Appear, #9 Exhibit Ex. 7_2017 South Sudan State Department Report, #10 Exhibit Ex. 8_Human Rights Watch - Soldier Assume We Are Rebels, #11 Exhibit Ex. 9_Affidavit Francis Mezan, #12 Exhibit Ex. 10_Human Rights Watch - Army Abuses Spread West, #13 Exhibit Ex. 11_Expert Affidavit and CV, #14 Exhibit Ex. 12_Motion to Reopen)(Kim, SangYeob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mezan v. US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Acting Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francis Wilson Mezan
Represented By: Sarah Sherman-Stokes
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: SangYeob Kim
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Sarah Sherman Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?