Artesi v. DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Artesi
Defendant: DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc. and Dennis LaBatte
Case Number: 1:2019cv00214
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 4/21/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Pretrial Statements due 3/20/2020. JERS Statement due 3/20/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/23/2019. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 4/3/2020. (kad)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving with changes #7 Discovery Plan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Ready for Trial on 4/21/2020. Length of Trial 4-5 days. Case Track: Standard. Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/23/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/3/2019. Discovery deadline 2/1/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 11/22/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 10/1/2019.(kad)
March 27, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. Pretrial Conference reset for 4/4/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone is cancelled. Order to issue. (kad)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Dennis LaBatte. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Feeney, Dona)
March 13, 2019 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference reset for 4/4/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/29/2019. (kad)
March 12, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Reason for Reassignment: Consent to Jurisdiction filed. The new case designation is: 19-cv-214-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(lml)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Feeney, Dona)
March 11, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/29/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Dennis LaBatte.(Feeney, Dona)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Feeney, Dona)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2019-CV-00041, Strafford County Superior Court(Hilliard, Joshua)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua S. Hilliard on behalf of DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Dennis LaBatte Attorney Joshua S. Hilliard added to party DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua S. Hilliard added to party Dennis LaBatte(pty:dft).(Hilliard, Joshua)
March 5, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc., Dennis LaBatte. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by March 12, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 3/12/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ej)
March 5, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
March 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-214-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford County Superior Court, case number 219-2019-CV-00041 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1778976) filed by Dennis LaBatte, DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 3/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice to Counsel, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Feeney, Dona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artesi v. DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeMoulas Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis LaBatte
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Represented By: Joshua S. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Artesi
Represented By: Leslie H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?