Sierra Club, Inc. et al v. Granite Shore Power LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sierra Club, Inc. and Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Granite Shore Power LLC, Public Service of New Hampshire and GSP Merrimack LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00216
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Thomas G. DeLawrence complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 5/2/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that P. Stephen Gidiere III complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 5/2/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer L. Parent on behalf of GSP Merrimack LLC, Granite Shore Power LLC, Public Service of New Hampshire Attorney Jennifer L. Parent added to party GSP Merrimack LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer L. Parent added to party Granite Shore Power LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer L. Parent added to party Public Service of New Hampshire(pty:dft).(Parent, Jennifer)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Public Service of New Hampshire disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Glahn, Wilbur)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by GSP Merrimack LLC, Granite Shore Power LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Glahn, Wilbur)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Thomas G. DeLawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1802601.) filed by GSP Merrimack LLC, Granite Shore Power LLC, Public Service of New Hampshire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Thomas G. DeLawrence)(Glahn, Wilbur)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for P. Stephen Gidiere, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1802599.) filed by GSP Merrimack LLC, Granite Shore Power LLC, Public Service of New Hampshire. Attorney Wilbur A. Glahn, III added to party GSP Merrimack LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Wilbur A. Glahn, III added to party Granite Shore Power LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Wilbur A. Glahn, III added to party Public Service of New Hampshire(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of P. Stephen Gidiere, III)(Glahn, Wilbur)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Reed Super complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 3/28/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Edan Rotenberg complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. Granted on the condition that Edan Rotenberg complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 3/28/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Reed Super to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1783687.) filed by Sierra Club, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 3/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Reed Super)(Mullen, Daniel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Edan Rotenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1783680.) filed by Sierra Club, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 3/26/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Edan Rotenberg)(Mullen, Daniel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Public Service of New Hampshire by Sierra Club, Inc., Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 3/7/2019. Answer Follow Up on 5/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Mullen, Daniel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to GSP Merrimack LLC by Sierra Club, Inc., Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 3/7/2019. Answer Follow Up on 5/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Mullen, Daniel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Granite Shore Power LLC by Sierra Club, Inc., Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 3/7/2019. Answer Follow Up on 5/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Mullen, Daniel)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc., Sierra Club, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Mullen, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Sierra Club, Inc., Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Sierra Club, Inc. and Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by March 11, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 3/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ej)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to GSP Merrimack LLC, Granite Shore Power LLC, Public Service of New Hampshire. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ej)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
March 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-216-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1779566 filed by Sierra Club, Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NP DES Permit, #2 Exhibit NOIS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Waiver PSNH, #5 Summons - Waiver Granite Shore Power, LLC, #6 Summons - Waiver GSP Merrimack, LLC)(Mullen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club, Inc. et al v. Granite Shore Power LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Mullen
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Reed Super
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Shore Power LLC
Represented By: Thomas G. DeLawrence
Represented By: P. Stephen Gidiere, III
Represented By: Wilbur A. Glahn, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Service of New Hampshire
Represented By: Thomas G. DeLawrence
Represented By: P. Stephen Gidiere, III
Represented By: Wilbur A. Glahn, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSP Merrimack LLC
Represented By: Wilbur A. Glahn, III
Represented By: Jennifer L. Parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?