Essa v. Genzyme Corporation
Plaintiff: Evelyn Essa
Defendant: Genzyme Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00222
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 8/14/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 8/28/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 9/15/2020 09:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lml)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #8 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order with the following modifications: Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/15/2020. Trial set for 9/15/2020. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/30/2019. Discovery deadline 2/28/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/15/2020. (lml)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Genzyme Corporation. (Kaczmarek, Christopher)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #6 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Defendant's answer was filed on March 29, 2019, accordingly the motion is denied as moot. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(lml)
March 29, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2019 02:30 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 4/24/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Genzyme Corporation.(Kaczmarek, Christopher)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 2, 2019 filed by Genzyme Corporation.(Kaczmarek, Christopher)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 ///NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Count II Only by Evelyn Essa(Meier, Christopher) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add 3 slashes (lml).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 3/27/2019. (lml)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to March 27, 2019 or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Genzyme Corporation.(Kaczmarek, Christopher)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2018-CV-01013, Hillsborough Northern District County Superior Court(Kaczmarek, Christopher)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ej)
March 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-222-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Genzyme Corporation disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Kaczmarek, Christopher)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court Northern District, case number 216-2018-CV-01013 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1780561) filed by Genzyme Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 3/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaczmarek, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essa v. Genzyme Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genzyme Corporation
Represented By: Christopher B. Kaczmarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Essa
Represented By: Christopher T. Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?