Bouldin v. FCI Berlin, Warden et al
Petitioner: Chapelle Alphonso Bouldin
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden and Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director
Case Number: 1:2019cv00376
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ///REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241, recommending that the district judge dismiss the pending petition for lack of jurisdiction. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 5/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb)
April 23, 2019 Filing Fee paid - case converted to a civil case: $ 5 (Credit Card), receipt number 14649017742 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. New case number is 1:19-cv-376-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 6/17/2019. (ej)
April 16, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
April 12, 2019 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (ej)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Chapelle Alphonso Bouldin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bouldin v. FCI Berlin, Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chapelle Alphonso Bouldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?