Cummings v. Eggleston
Plaintiff: Thomas Jack Cummings
Defendant: Jonathan Eggleston
Case Number: 1:2019cv00496
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Pretrial Conference reset for 7/22/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/15/2019. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial.(jb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Thomas Jack Cummings. Follow up on Objection on 6/13/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Cole, Carolyn)
May 30, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 6/18/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(cmp)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Jonathan Eggleston.(Smith, Donald)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Jonathan Eggleston by Thomas Jack Cummings. Served/Mailed on 5/8/2019. Answer Follow Up on 5/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Cole, Carolyn)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Jonathan Eggleston. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
May 7, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
May 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-496-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1809771 filed by Thomas Jack Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Cole, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings v. Eggleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Eggleston
Represented By: Donald L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jack Cummings
Represented By: Carolyn K. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?