Thompson v. Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc.
Plaintiff: Shaun Thompson
Defendant: Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00513
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #6 Reply to Objection to Motion filed by Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc. Documents must be provided in an electronically converted PDF text searchable format in accordance with A.P. 2.3(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lml)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc.. Surreply due by 6/17/2019. (Kline, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 MOTION to Dismiss with Incorporated Memorandum of Law HEARING REQUESTED filed by Shaun Thompson. Follow up on Reply on 6/11/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo in Support of Obj.)(List, Sean) Modified on 6/4/2019 to add: hearing requested text(lml).
May 30, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/29/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lml)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 6/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kline, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2019-cv-00420, Rockingham County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit True Copy Attest - Appearance, #2 Exhibit True Copy Attest - Complaint, #3 Exhibit True Copy Attest - Notice of Default, #4 Exhibit True Copy Attest - Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit True Copy Attest - Return of Service, #6 Exhibit True Copy Attest - Summons, #7 Exhibit True Copy Attest - Duplicate of Return of Service)(Kline, Robert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Kline, Robert)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by May 15, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 5/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
May 7, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt)
May 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-513-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham Superior Court, case number 218-2019-cv-00420 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1811316) filed by Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 5/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint filed in Superior Court)(Kline, Robert) (Additional attachments added on 5/8/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Thompson
Represented By: Sean Robert List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G. White Tile Co. Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?