Young v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Petitioner: Lee Young
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00527
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (lw)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to September 16, 2019 filed by FCI Berlin, Warden. Follow up on Objection on 8/7/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aframe, Seth)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed, via certified mail to US Attorney General, as to FCI Berlin, Warden. (lml)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed, via Certified Mail, as to FCI Berlin, Warden. (lml)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth R. Aframe on behalf of FCI Berlin, Warden Attorney Seth R. Aframe added to party FCI Berlin, Warden(pty:res).(Aframe, Seth)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 US Marshal Return of Service to US Attorney District of NH Executed as to FCI Berlin, Warden. Served/Mailed on 5/31/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/2/2019. (lml)
May 30, 2019 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to US Attorney General and FCI Berlin, Warden. Service given to US Marshal for delivery to US Attorney for the District of NH per #3 Order Directing Service.(lml)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. The clerk's office shall prepare and issue a summons for service on respondent, FCI Berlin Warden Robert Hazelwood, and shall provide the summons, the petition (Doc. No. 1), and this Order to the United States Marshals Service for delivery to the United States Attorney for the District of New Hampshire. The clerk's office shall deliver copies of the petition (Doc. No. 1), and this Order to both the Attorney General of the United States and Warden Hazelwood by certified mail. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (lml)
May 28, 2019 Filing Fee paid - case converted to a civil case: $5 (Check), receipt number 14649017877 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. New case number is 1:19-cv-527-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 7/12/2019. (bt)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (bt)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241. filed by Lee Young. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lee Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?