Brooks v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Brooks
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TD Auto Finance, Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc, Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion LLC, Trans Union, LLC and Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00570
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #58 Motion for J. Anthony Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(cmp)
January 24, 2020 Filing 58 Assented to MOTION for J. Anthony Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-1929044.) filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Affidavit of J. Anthony Love)(Long, Danielle)
January 10, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Elizabeth Emmanuel on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC(Emmanuel, Elizabeth)
December 26, 2019 Filing 56 FILED IN ERROR - see doc. no. #57 - NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by Danielle Andrews Long on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC(Long, Danielle) Modified on 1/10/2020 to add filed in error text (jb).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #55 STIPULATION re: Dismissal of a Party With Prejudice as to Experian. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 55 ///STIPULATION re: Dismissal of a Party With Prejudice as to Experian by Robert Brooks(Phillips, Roger) Modified on 12/23/2019 to add /// (jb).
December 17, 2019 Filing 54 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint filed by Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc..(Landry, Ryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 53 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union, LLC.(Policchio, James)
December 10, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Carrier, Megan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #50 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to December 10, 2019 re #44 Amended Complaint.. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 12/10/2019. (jb)
November 26, 2019 Filing 51 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint filed by TD Auto Finance.(Kenney, Michele)
November 26, 2019 Filing 50 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 10, 2019 filed by Trans Union, LLC.(Policchio, James)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #48 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 17, 2019 Defendant, Portsmouth Chevrolet Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer #44 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 12/17/2019. (jb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Long, Danielle)
November 25, 2019 Filing 48 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 17, 2019 Defendant, Portsmouth Chevrolet Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc..(Landry, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #47 Assented to MOTION to Seal #44 Amended Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #45 Motion to Continue Answer Deadline. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
November 19, 2019 Filing 45 Assented to MOTION to Continue Answer Deadline filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 12/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carrier, Megan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 47 Assented to MOTION to Seal #44 Amended Complaint filed by Robert Brooks.(jb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 46 SEALED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (unredacted) at Level I filed by Robert Brooks(jb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc., TD Auto Finance, Trans Union, LLC with jury demand filed by Robert Brooks.(Lodge, Hans)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #43 Redact Portsmouth Chevrolet Notice of Intent to Seek Apportionment of Liability and DeBenedetto Disclosure Doc. #41 Portsmouth Chevrolet's Redacted Notice of Intent to Seek Apportionment of Liability and DeBenedetto Disclosure. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 43 Redact Portsmouth Chevrolet Notice of Intent to Seek Apportionment of Liability and DeBenedetto Disclosure Doc. #41 Portsmouth Chevrolet's Redacted Notice of Intent to Seek Apportionment of Liability and DeBenedetto Disclosure filed by Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Exhibit Certificate of Service 11-6-19)(Landry, Ryan) Modified text to Notice instead of Motion and terminate follow up deadline (jb).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #42 Motion for Seal Defendant Portsmouth Chevrolet's Notice of Intent to Seek Apportionment of Liability and DeBenedetto Disclosure Doc. 41. Text of Order: Granted in part. The sealing is granted, but within 7 days, counsel shall re-file the notice with redactions to the relevant portions of the notice as opposed to sealing the entire filing. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 42 Assented to MOTION Seal Defendant Portsmouth Chevrolet's Notice of Intent to Seek Apportionment of Liability and DeBenedetto Disclosure Doc. 41 filed by Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc..(Landry, Ryan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Notice of Intent to Seek Apportionment of Liability and DeBenedetto Disclosure Defendant, Portsmouth Chevrolet's Notice of Intent to Seek apportionment of Liability and DeBenedetto Disclosure by Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc..(Landry, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROTECTIVE ORDER re documents produced in discovery. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #39 Joint Assented to Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 39 Joint Assented to MOTION for Protective Order filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Protective Order)(Carrier, Megan)
September 17, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 5/11/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 5/25/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 6/8/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER approving (with changes) #34 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5-7 days. Case Track: Complex. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Stipulations as outlined 9/27/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 12/11/2019. Mediation Follow Up on 1/15/2020. Discovery Status Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 1/5/2021. Discovery deadline 1/29/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 2/1/2021.(jb)
September 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/12/2019. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: In person: Roger B. Phillips, Telephonically: Hans W. Lodge) (Defts Atty: In person: Megan C. Carrier, Lisa Snow Wade, Michele E. Kenney, Ryan Denis Landry. Telephonically: Danielle Andrews Long, Elizabeth Emmanuel, Christopher J. Lopata, James L. Policchio, Blaec C. Croft)(Total Hearing Time: 38 minutes) (jb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #34 Proposed Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for September 12, 2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 Joint Assented to MOTION for Leave to Attend Pretrial Conference Telephonically. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Elizabeth Emmanuel complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 9/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #35 Assented to MOTION for Elizabeth Emmanuel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1859289.) filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. No description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. All future pleadings should contain exhibit descriptions. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-369-5374.(jb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 36 Joint Assented to MOTION for Leave to Attend Pretrial Conference Telephonically filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Carrier, Megan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 35 Assented to MOTION for Elizabeth Emmanuel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1859289.) filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Elizabeth Emmanuel)(Long, Danielle) Modified on 9/6/2019 to add exhibit description (jb).
September 5, 2019 Filing 34 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Robert Brooks. (Lodge, Hans)
September 5, 2019 RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. (time change only) Pretrial Conference reset for 9/12/2019 at 03:00 PM (from 2:00 PM) before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/5/2019. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. (jb)
September 4, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Carrier, Megan)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Assented to MOTION to Amend #26 Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion to Amend using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2019.(jb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 32 Assented to MOTION to Amend Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Carrier, Megan)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Joshua I. Hammack complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/30/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Christopher J. Lopata complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/30/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 31 Assented to MOTION for Joshua I. Hammack to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1849981.) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of Joshua I. Hammack)(Carrier, Megan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Christopher J. Lopata to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1849966.) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Christopher J. Lopata)(Carrier, Megan)
August 15, 2019 RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. (date change) Pretrial Conference reset for 9/12/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/5/2019. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Blaec C. Croft complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/26/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER VACATING Order on Motion for Blaec C. Croft to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: The endorsed Order dated 8/9/19 is VACATED. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The undersigned recuses himself from presiding over this case. The case shall be assigned to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
August 9, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Reason for Reassignment: Judge DiClerico recused. The new case designation is: 19-cv-570-JL. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (vln)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order VACATED. ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Motion for Blaec C. Croft to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Blaec C. Croft submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/19/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(gla) Modified on 8/12/2019 to add: VACATED (gla).
August 8, 2019 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION for Blaec C. Croft to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by TD Auto Finance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Blaec C. Croft)(Kenney, Michele) Modified on 8/8/2019 to remove "No fee paid." (vln).
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Joseph A. DiClerico Jr. Follow up on Discovery Plan 8/16/2019.(ko)
July 26, 2019 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement by Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Landry, Ryan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, and Affirmative Defenses filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Carrier, Megan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by TD Auto Finance.(Kenney, Michele)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend Time Respond to Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand Defendant Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc.'s Answer to the Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc..(Landry, Ryan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Denis Landry on behalf of Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc. Appearance of Counsel Attorney Ryan Denis Landry added to party Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc.(pty:dft).(Landry, Ryan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Johnson on behalf of Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc. Appearance of Counsel Attorney Michael P. Johnson added to party Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc.(pty:dft).(Johnson, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Answer Follow Up on 7/25/2019. (ko)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union, LLC.(Policchio, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement by TD Auto Finance disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Kenney, Michele)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by TD Auto Finance.(Kenney, Michele)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michele E. Kenney on behalf of TD Auto Finance Attorney Michele E. Kenney added to party TD Auto Finance(pty:dft).(Kenney, Michele)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Long, Danielle)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Long, Danielle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Carrier, Megan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Carrier, Megan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan C. Carrier on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Attorney Megan C. Carrier added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Carrier, Megan)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Cole on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Attorney Christopher Cole added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Cole, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for James L. Policchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that James L. Policchio submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. ECF Registration Deadline set for 6/24/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(gla)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for James L. Policchio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1826200.) filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of James Policchio)(Wade, Lisa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Wade, Lisa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Snow Wade on behalf of Trans Union, LLC Attorney Lisa Snow Wade added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft).(Wade, Lisa)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc. by Robert Brooks. Served/Mailed on 6/4/2019. Answer Follow Up on 6/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Lodge, Hans)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Robert Brooks. Served/Mailed on 6/4/2019. Answer Follow Up on 6/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Lodge, Hans)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to TD Auto Finance by Robert Brooks. Served/Mailed on 6/4/2019. Answer Follow Up on 6/25/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Lodge, Hans)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Trans Union, LLC by Robert Brooks. Served/Mailed on 6/3/2019. Answer Follow Up on 6/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Lodge, Hans)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Robert Brooks. Served/Mailed on 6/3/2019. Answer Follow Up on 6/24/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Lodge, Hans)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Hans W. Lodge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(ko)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Hans W. Lodge to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1823841.) filed by Robert Brooks. Follow up on Objection on 6/21/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit in Support of PHV Motion)(Phillips, Roger)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc, TD Auto Finance, Trans Union, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Hans W. Lodge, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 6/28/2019. (ej)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
May 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-570-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1819365 filed by Robert Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Phillips, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #3 CORRECTED Complaint) (ej).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brooks
Represented By: Roger B. Phillips
Represented By: Hans W. Lodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Carrier
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Represented By: Christopher J. Lopata
Represented By: Joshua I. Hammack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance
Represented By: Michele E. Kenney
Represented By: Blaec C. Croft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Danielle Andrews Long
Represented By: Elizabeth Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: James L. Policchio
Represented By: Lisa Snow Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portsmouth Chevrolet, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Johnson
Represented By: Ryan Denis Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?