National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Jane Doe and Jessica Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00587
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: For the reasons therein, National Fire's motion to identify Jane Doe by that pseudonym (document no. 3) and the motion to seal three exhibits (document no. 6) are granted. Documents nos. 1-4, 1-5, and 1-6 shall be sealed at Level I, LR83.12(b)(1). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jane Doe by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 6/7/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/9/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Burt, Gary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to Jessica Davis, Jane Doe. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Identify Party Using a Pseudonym filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 6/17/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Burt, Gary)
June 3, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
June 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-587-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Burt, Gary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1821679 filed by National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application Documentation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Midwife Program Quotation, #3 Exhibit 3 - Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 - 3/18/19 Complaint Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Incident Reporting Form, #6 Exhibit 6 - 4/11/19 Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons - Waiver Jessica Davis, #9 Summons - Waiver Jane Doe)(Burt, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary M. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?