Moore et al v. Hillsborough County et al
Plaintiff: Lorri Moore
Defendant: Jane Does, Patrick Harris, Carl Brown, John Does, Hillsborough County, Vincent Williams, Christine Mellnick, Amber Leary and Paul F. Harris
Case Number: 1:2019cv00613
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Vogelman, Lawrence)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Paul F. Harris by Lorri Moore. Served/Mailed on 6/20/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Vogelman, Lawrence)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER striking 9 Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment. Text of Order: Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment (doc. do. 9) deemed stricken as not all parties have appeared in this case. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 and LR 73.1(b)(2)(B). The document shall be deleted from the docket and the docket text shall be amended to add "DOCUMENT AND DOCKET TEXT REMOVED". The document shall be refiled at the appropriate time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT AND DOCKET TEXT REMOVED. See the Court's 6/24/2019 Endorsed Order. Modified on 6/24/2019 to add: "DOCUMENT AND DOCKET TEXT REMOVED". See the Court's 6/24/2019 Endorsed Order" (kad).
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carl Brown, Hillsborough County, Amber Leary, Christine Mellnick, Vincent Williams by Lorri Moore. Served/Mailed on 6/17/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Vogelman, Lawrence)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A. Curran on behalf of Carl Brown, Hillsborough County, Amber Leary, Christine Mellnick, Vincent Williams (waivers and acceptance of service contemporaneously issued back to plaintiff's counsel, per FRCP 4) Attorney John A. Curran added to party Carl Brown(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Hillsborough County(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Amber Leary(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Christine Mellnick(pty:dft), Attorney John A. Curran added to party Vincent Williams(pty:dft).(Curran, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carly Marie Cengher on behalf of Lorri Moore Attorney Carly Marie Cengher added to party Lorri Moore(pty:pla).(Cengher, Carly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Paul F. Harris. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (bt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand filed by Lorri Moore. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver Notice-Waiver)(Vogelman, Lawrence)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Carl Brown, Patrick Harris, Hillsborough County, Amber Leary, Christine Mellnick, Vincent Williams. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (bt)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (bt)
June 5, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-613-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1822831 filed by Estate of Deatrah Reilly, Lorri Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notices/Waivers)(Vogelman, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Hillsborough County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorri Moore
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Represented By: Carly Marie Cengher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Brown
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Williams
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Mellnick
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Leary
Represented By: John A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul F. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?