Bellefeuille et al v. Transformer Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eileen M Hughes, Deborah A Bellefeuille, Deborah A. Bellefeuille and Eileen M. Hughes
Defendant: Transformer Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00628
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Transformer Service, Inc. by Deborah A. Bellefeuille, Eileen M. Hughes. Served/Mailed on 6/19/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/21/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Transformer Service, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (ej)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. (ej)
June 7, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-628-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1824069 filed by Deborah A Bellefeuille, Eileen M Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter to Bellefeuille, #2 Exhibit B- Charge of Discrimination- Bellefeuille, #3 Exhibit C- Right to Sue- Bellefeuille, #4 Exhibit D- Charge of Discrimination- Hughes, #5 Exhibit E- Right to Sue- Hughes, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Lawsuit, #8 Summons - Waiver)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellefeuille et al v. Transformer Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transformer Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen M Hughes
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A Bellefeuille
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Bellefeuille
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen M. Hughes
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?