Patriot Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patriot Insurance Company
Defendant: NuTone, Inc., Broan-NuTone, LLC and Nortek, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00631
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order AMENDED ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to MOTION to Set Aside #7 Clerk's Entry of Default. Text of Order: Granted. The default against Broan-NuTone, LLC and Nortek, Inc. is stricken. The parties are in agreement that plaintiff will file an amended complaint against Broan-NuTone LLC as the sole defendant. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before August 19, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to MOTION to Set Aside #7 Clerk's Entry of Default. Text of Order: Granted. The default against Broan-NuTone, LLC is stricken. The parties are in agreement that plaintiff will file an amended complaint against Broan-NuTone LLC as the sole defendant. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before August 19, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Set Aside #7 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Broan-NuTone, LLC. Attorney Andrew D. Black added to party Broan-NuTone, LLC(pty:dfltd). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1, Emails)(Black, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance Local Rule 55.1 (a) by Patriot Insurance Company (Sherman, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 STRICKEN (see Order dated 8/5/2019) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Broan-NuTone, LLC, Nortek, Inc. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court.(kad) Modified on 8/5/2019 to add: "STRICKEN (see Order dated 8/5/2019)"(kad).
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Nortek, Inc. by Patriot Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 6/24/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Broan-NuTone, LLC by Patriot Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 6/24/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sherman, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to Broan-NuTone, LLC, Nortek, Inc., NuTone, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (bt)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (bt)
June 10, 2019 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-631-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Patriot Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Sherman, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1824517 filed by Patriot Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Broan-NuTone Summons, #3 Summons - Waiver NuTone Summons, #4 Summons - Waiver Nortek Summons)(Sherman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patriot Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuTone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-NuTone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nortek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriot Insurance Company
Represented By: John P. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?