Elektrisola, Inc. v. Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elektrisola, Inc.
Defendant: Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc. and Omron Electronic Components, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00639
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 8/4/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 8/18/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 9/1/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER approving (with changes) #9 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. Affirmative defenses stricken as outlined. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 10/1/2019. Discovery Status Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Discovery deadline 4/24/2020. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 4/8/2020. Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/1/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 6/15/2020.(jb)
August 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/5/2019. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Matthew Vernon Burrows, Samantha Dowd Elliott (telephonic)) (Defts Atty: Barry P. Kaltenbach (telephonic), Christina Ann Ferrari)(Total Hearing Time: 17 minutes) (jb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samantha Dowd Elliott on behalf of Elektrisola, Inc. Attorney Samantha Dowd Elliott added to party Elektrisola, Inc.(pty:pla).(Elliott, Samantha)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Barry P. Kaltenbach complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/12/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 5, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Elektrisola, Inc.. (Burrows, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Barry P. Kaltenbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1841842.) filed by Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc., Omron Electronic Components, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Ferrari, Christina)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/29/2019. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc., Omron Electronic Components, LLC.(Ferrari, Christina)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by Elektrisola, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Burrows, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2019-CV-00225, Merrimack County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 True Copy Attest Complaint, #2 True Copy Attest Summons, #3 True Copy Attest Notice of Removal, #4 True Copy Attest Appearance)(Ferrari, Christina)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 7/12/2019. (jb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 12, 2019 filed by Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc., Omron Electronic Components, LLC.(Ferrari, Christina)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc., Omron Electronic Components, LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ferrari, Christina)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Omron Electronic Components, LLC, Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Elektrisola, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by July 3, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 7/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(bt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Ann Ferrari on behalf of Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc., Omron Electronic Components, LLC (Ferrari, Christina)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Omron Electronic Components, LLC, Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc., Omron Electronic Compnents, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by June, 19, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 6/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(bt)
June 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-639-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Merrimack County Superior Court, case number 217-2019-CV-00225 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1825706) filed by Omron Electronic Components, LLC, Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 7/3/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Related Materials, #2 Notice of Removal to Counsel, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferrari, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elektrisola, Inc. v. Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omron Automotive Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Ann Ferrari
Represented By: Barry P. Kaltenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omron Electronic Components, LLC
Represented By: Christina Ann Ferrari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elektrisola, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Vernon Burrows
Represented By: Samantha Dowd Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?