Brown v. Seabrook, NH, Town of et al
Plaintiff: Maria Y. Brown
Defendant: Town of Seabrook, NH, William Manzi, Michael Rabideau, Jason Janvrin and Seabrook, NH, Town of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00641
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to William Manzi by Maria Y. Brown. Served/Mailed on 6/20/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael Rabideau by Maria Y. Brown. Served/Mailed on 6/20/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Seabrook, NH, Town of by Maria Y. Brown. Served/Mailed on 6/20/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(King, Benjamin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jason Janvrin by Maria Y. Brown. Served/Mailed on 6/20/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Jason Janvrin, William Manzi, Michael Rabideau, Seabrook, NH, Town of. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
June 12, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-641-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1825803 filed by Maria Y. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B- Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice- Seabrook Clerk, #5 Waiver- Seabrook Clerk, #6 Notice- Seabrook Selectman, #7 Waiver- Seabrook Selectman, #8 Notice- Rabideau, #9 Waiver- Rabideau, #10 Notice- Manzi, #11 Waiver- Manzi, #12 Notice- Janvrin, #13 Waiver- Janvrin)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Seabrook, NH, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Seabrook, NH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Manzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rabideau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Janvrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seabrook, NH, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Y. Brown
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?