Don Shapiro, Inc. v. Philbrick's Fresh Market, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Don Shapiro, Inc.
Defendant: Phillip Allen Turner, Phillip Philbrick, Vicki K.B. Turner and Philbrick's Fresh Market, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00644
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Referring Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #13 Consent Order and Final Judgment. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (ko)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent Order and Final Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Joint Assented to MOTION for Judgment and Consent Order. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER terminating #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; terminating #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
June 24, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Laplante recused. The new case designation is: 19-cv-644-JD. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(jb)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante has been canceled and may be rescheduled before another judge if necessary. (cmp)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 22, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Assented to MOTION for Judgment and Consent Order filed by Don Shapiro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order and Final Judgment)(Tierney, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of summonses (Doc. 7), summonses attachment (Doc 7-1), Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 6) and Complaint (Doc. 1) as to Philbrick's Fresh Market, LLC, Phillip Allen Turner, Vicki K.B. Turner filed by Don Shapiro, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 6/19/2006. Answer Follow Up on 7/10/2006. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Tierney, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of TRO Order and pleadings as to Philbrick's Fresh Market, LLC, Phillip Allen Turner filed by Don Shapiro, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 6/14/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/5/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Tierney, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Gregory Brown submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 6/24/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses issued electronically as to Philbrick's Fresh Market, LLC, Phillip Allen Turner, Vicki K.B. Turner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
June 14, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The new case designation is: 1:19-cv-644-JL. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (ej)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lml)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Don Shapiro, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Tierney, Michael)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
June 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-644-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE filed by Don Shapiro, Inc. t/a Shapiro Produce. Follow up on Objection on 6/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law, #2 Declaration of Shapiro, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B 1 of 6 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit B 2 of 6 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit B 3 of 6 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit B 4 of 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit B 5 of 6 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit B 6 of 6 to Declaration, #10 Attorney Certification, #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tierney, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Don Shapiro, Inc. t/a Shapiro Produce. Follow up on Objection on 6/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo of Law, #2 Declaration of A Shapiro, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B 1 of 6 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B 2 of 6 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B 3 of 6 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B 4 of 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B 5 of 6 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B 6 of 6 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration)(Tierney, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Gregory Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1826050.) filed by Don Shapiro, Inc. t/a Shapiro Produce. Follow up on Objection on 6/27/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Tierney, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1826029 filed by Don Shapiro, Inc. t/a Shapiro Produce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons on Corp, #3 Summons on V Turner, #4 Summons on P Turner, #5 Corporate Disclosure)(Tierney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Don Shapiro, Inc. v. Philbrick's Fresh Market, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Allen Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Philbrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki K.B. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philbrick's Fresh Market, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Shapiro, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Brown
Represented By: Michael J. Tierney
Represented By: Gregory A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?