Howarth v. Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Defendant: Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 9/18/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc..(Graham, Owen)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to August 9, 2019. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Answer Follow Up on 8/9/2019. (ko)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Miville Deschenes on behalf of Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc. Attorney Daniel Miville Deschenes added to party Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.(pty:dft).(Deschenes, Daniel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 9, 2019 filed by Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc..(Graham, Owen)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Disregard: Notice filed in error. NOTICE Regarding Service as to Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.Affidavit of Service due on 8/9/2019.(ko) Modified on 7/29/2019 to add: disregard text. Answer due is due 8/2/2019(ko).
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc. by Morgan Howarth. Served/Mailed on 7/1/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hedges, Katherine)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to August 2, 2019 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Answer Follow Up on 8/2/2019. (ko)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Graham, Owen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 2, 2019 filed by Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.. Attorney Owen R. Graham added to party Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.(pty:dft).(Graham, Owen)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for R. Buck McKinney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that R. Buck McKinney submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 7/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(ko)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued electronically as to Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Morgan Howarth(Hedges, Katherine)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for R. Buck McKinney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1828980.) filed by Morgan Howarth. Follow up on Objection on 7/5/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) R. Buck McKinney in Support of Pro Hac Vice)(Hage, Jamie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington, DC. (ej)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of R. Buck. McKinney, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 7/22/2019. (ej)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
June 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-670-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 AO 121 Form - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Morgan Howarth(Hage, Jamie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1828614 filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copies of photographs at issue, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's registration certificate, #3 Exhibit Examples of Defendant's use of Plaintiff's photographs, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Carlisle Wood Plank Floors Inc.)(Hage, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howarth v. Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Wide Plank Floors, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Miville Deschenes
Represented By: Owen R. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Represented By: Jamie N. Hage
Represented By: R. Buck McKinney
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?