Valsoft Corporation, Inc. v. Bacalan
Plaintiff: Valsoft Corporation, Inc.
Defendant: Joseph Adam Bacalan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00672
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - filed by Joseph Adam Bacalan.(cmp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Joseph Adam Bacalan by Valsoft Corporation, Inc.. Served/Mailed on 7/15/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/5/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hedges, Katherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Mail Returned - Return to Sender No Such Street Unable to Forward re Notice - ECF, Case Assigned, #3 Summons - Waiver Issued, Order Re: Local Counsel.(jb)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Frank N. Gaeta complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. ECF Registration Deadline set for 7/1/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(jb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Frank N. Gaeta to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1828865.) filed by Valsoft Corporation, Inc.. Follow up on Objection on 7/5/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Frank N. Gaeta in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application)(Hage, Jamie)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Joseph Adam Bacalan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of F. Gaeta, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 7/22/2019. (ej)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
June 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-672-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Valsoft Corporation, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hage, Jamie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1828649 filed by Valsoft Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Copy of Agreement and Guarantee, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Joseph Adam Bacalan)(Hage, Jamie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valsoft Corporation, Inc. v. Bacalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Adam Bacalan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valsoft Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie N. Hage
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Hedges
Represented By: Frank N. Gaeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?