Currier v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Barry Currier
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, Ford Motor Company and Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00676
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC.(Polglase, Holly)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Daimler Trucks North America, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Polglase, Holly)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Daimler Trucks North America, LLC Attorney Holly M. Polglase added to party Daimler Trucks North America, LLC(pty:dft).(Polglase, Holly)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint as a Matter of Course filed by Barry Currier. Follow up on Objection on 8/20/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Summons - Waiver DCo LLC Summons)(Carr, Anthony)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Polglase, Holly)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/6/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & Complaint as to Daimler Trucks North America, LLC filed by Barry Currier. Served/Mailed on 7/18/2019. Answer Follow Up on 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MCSD Affid of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Green card)(Carr, Anthony)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 6, 2019 filed by Arvinmeritor, Inc..(Polglase, Holly)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Polglase, Holly)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. Attorney Holly M. Polglase added to party Arvinmeritor, Inc.(pty:dft).(Polglase, Holly)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC disclosing a parent company,, and. (Durney, Peter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand and Affirmative Defenses filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Durney, Peter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Attorney Peter M. Durney added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft).(Durney, Peter)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC by Barry Currier. Served/Mailed on 7/2/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/23/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carr, Anthony)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Ford Motor Company by Barry Currier. Served/Mailed on 7/2/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/23/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carr, Anthony)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Arvinmeritor, Inc. by Barry Currier. Served/Mailed on 7/2/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/23/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carr, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Arvinmeritor, Inc., Daimler Trucks North America, LLC, Ford Motor Company, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
June 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-676-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1829268 filed by Barry Currier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Ford Motor Company, #3 Summons - Waiver Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, #4 Summons - Waiver Arvinmeritor, Inc., #5 Summons - Waiver Daimler Trucks)(Carr, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currier v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America, LLC
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor, Inc.
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Currier
Represented By: Anthony Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?