Vu v. RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonny Vu
Defendant: RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00680
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Motions terminated: #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. MOTION REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT NO. 15. (js)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit of William Hamblin III, #3 Exhibit A-1 October 2015 email chain, #4 Exhibit A-2 Contrct, #5 Exhibit A-3 Sale Order, #6 Exhibit A-4 Texas Liability Insurance Card, #7 Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain)(Johnson, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/22/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A-Affidavit of William Hamblin III, #3 Exhibit A-1 October 2015 email chain, #4 Exhibit A-2 Contract, #5 Exhibit A-3 Sale Order, #6 Exhibit A-4 Texas Liability Insurance Card, #7 Exhibit A-5 January 2016 email chain)(Johnson, Matthew)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Denied as moot in light of the Amended Complaint filed on August 1, 2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff Sonny Vu's Objection to Defendant RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, #2 Exhibit A to Memo of Law - Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B to Memo of Law - judicial caseload profiles)(Herz, Courtney)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sonny Vu. Follow up on Reply on 8/8/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Sonny Vu's Objection to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sonny Vu, #3 Exhibit B - Email, #4 Exhibit C - Website and Facebook)(Herz, Courtney)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. with jury demand filed by Sonny Vu.(Herz, Courtney)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to Motion for Robert J. Bogdanowicz III to Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Robert J. Bogdanowicz III, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(de)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to Motion for Whitney L. Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Whitney L. Warren, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/8/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(de)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Robert J. Bogdanowicz III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1841033.) filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Robert Bogdanowicz III)(Johnson, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Whitney L. Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1841031.) filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Whitney Warren, Esq.)(Johnson, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion for John C. Scheller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that John C. Scheller, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/5/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Assented to Motion for Anne T. Freeland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Anne T. Freeland, Esq. submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/5/2019.To access the online registration form, click #HERE. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE.(js)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for John C. Scheller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1840001.) filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) John C. Scheller)(Herz, Courtney)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Anne T. Freeland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1839939.) filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Anne T. Freeland, Esq.)(Herz, Courtney)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Devin K. Bolger on behalf of RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. Attorney Devin K. Bolger added to party RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bolger, Devin)
July 19, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. JOINT Discovery Plan DUE BY 8/23/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 REFILED. SEE DOCUMENT NO. 15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William S. Hamblin, III, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-1 to Hamblin Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-2 to Hamblin Affidavit)(Johnson, Matthew) Modified on 8/9/2019 to add: Refiled text(js).
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Matthew R. Johnson added to party RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/1/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of William S. Hamblin, III, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-1 to Hamblin Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex. A-2 to Hamblin Affidavit)(Johnson, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc. by Sonny Vu. Served/Mailed on 6/25/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/16/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Herz, Courtney)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej)
June 21, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-680-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1829399 filed by Sonny Vu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver). Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Herz, Courtney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vu v. RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Vu
Represented By: Courtney H. G. Herz
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Represented By: Anne T. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSI Racing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Bogdanowicz, III
Represented By: Whitney L. Warren
Represented By: Matthew R. Johnson
Represented By: Devin K. Bolger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?