Bischoff v. USA
Petitioner: William A. Bischoff
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00681
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Appellate Case Number: Court of Appeals 19-1737 re #5 Notice of Appeal filed by William A. Bischoff.(ko)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Certificate transmitting Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals, documents numbered 3 - 7 re #5 Notice of Appeal. A copy of the Notice of Appeal mailed to all parties this date.(ko)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Appeal Cover Sheet as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by William A. Bischoff. (ko)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Judgment by William A. Bischoff. File-stamped copy to be sent to parties/USCA by Clerks Office. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel and pro se parties should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at # http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf(ko)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #3 Order on Motion to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (vln)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ///ORDER denying #1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255 and denying #2 MOTION to Reduce Sentence Pursuant to 28 USC 2255. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(vln)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
June 21, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-681-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge. (bt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Reduce Sentence Pursuant to 28 USC 2255 filed by William A. Bischoff. (bt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255. Notice of Filing to US Attorney with copy of the motion. See also Criminal Case No. 1:17-cr-196-JD. filed by William A. Bischoff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bischoff v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William A. Bischoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?