Olsson v. Management Health Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Karen Olsson
Defendant: Management Health Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00683
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 12/8/2020. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 12/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 1/5/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving (with changes) #7 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-5 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Amendment of Pleadings Deadline set for 12/1/2019. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/1/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/8/2019. Discovery deadline 8/1/2020. Discovery Status Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 7/15/2020. Mediation Follow Up on 6/1/2020. (jb)
August 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/12/2019. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Sean Robert List) (Defts Atty: K. Joshua Scott)(Total Hearing Time: 22 minutes) (jb)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROCEDURAL ORDER re Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 12, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Management Health Solutions, Inc.. (Scott, K.)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 8/5/2019. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Management Health Solutions, Inc..(Scott, K.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 213-2019-CV-00127, Cheshire County Superior Court(Ford, Debra)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to July 15, 2019 re #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 7/15/2019. (jb)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt)
June 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-683-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by K. Joshua Scott on behalf of Management Health Solutions, Inc. Attorney K. Joshua Scott added to party Management Health Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft).(Scott, K.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 15, 2019 filed by Management Health Solutions, Inc..(Ford, Debra)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Management Health Solutions, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Ford, Debra)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Cheshire County Superior Court, case number 213-2019-CV-00127 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1829813) filed by Management Health Solutions, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 7/15/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ford, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsson v. Management Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Represented By: Debra Weiss Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Olsson
Represented By: Sean Robert List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?