On Your Side Investors, LLC v. Knisley et al
Plaintiff: On Your Side Investors, LLC
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC, MJJ Realty Trust, US Internal Revenue Service, Diane L. Knisley and Paul B. Knisley
Case Number: 1:2019cv00692
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons issued electronically as to Midland Funding, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ej)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by All Plaintiffs (McDonald, Patrick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 FILED IN ERROR. REFILED, SEE DOC. NO. 9. REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by All Plaintiffs (McDonald, Patrick) Modified on 8/13/2019 to add: Filed in error text(js).
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick John McDonald on behalf of On Your Side Investors, LLC Notice of Appearance Attorney Patrick John McDonald added to party On Your Side Investors, LLC(pty:pla).(McDonald, Patrick)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to August 30, 2019. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/30/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to August 30, 2019 filed by US Internal Revenue Service.(McCormack, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by On Your Side Investors, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. Disclosure Statement (Hardiman, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Clerk's Notice - No Disclosure Statement Filed. On Your Side Investors, LLC is directed to file a disclosure statement within 24 hours of this notice. (js)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Midland Funding, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by 8/2/2019.(js)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. MJJ Realty Trust shall file a disclosure statement by 8/2/2019. (js)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to: MJJ Realty Trust. Counsel to file an appearance or the file will be referred to a judicial officer for further action. Compliance Deadline set for 8/2/2019.(js)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2019-CV-00322, Hillsborough County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Record - Part 1, #2 State Court Record - Part 2)(McCormack, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint to July 29, 2019. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/29/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint to July 29, 2019 filed by US Internal Revenue Service.(McCormack, Michael)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Diane L. Knisley. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. On Your Side Investors, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by July 19, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 7/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Diane L. Knisley. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Midland Funding, LLC; MJJ Realty Trust shall file a disclosure statement by July 5, 2019. Disclosure Statement due 7/5/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (bt)
June 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-692-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough Superior Court, case number 226-2019-CV-00322 (No fee paid, USA or IFP.) filed by Internal Revenue Service. Answer Follow Up on 7/19/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Notice of Filing of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCormack, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: On Your Side Investors, LLC v. Knisley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJJ Realty Trust
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane L. Knisley
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul B. Knisley
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: On Your Side Investors, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hardiman
Represented By: Patrick John McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?