Fedele v. Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, Ltd

Plaintiff: Frank A. Fedele
Defendant: Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2019cv00700
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 9/3/2019. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, Ltd.(Suslak, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Suslak on behalf of Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, Ltd Attorney Brian Andrew Suslak added to party Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, Ltd(pty:dft).(Suslak, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of complaint, summons as to Frank A. Fedele filed by Frank A. Fedele. Served/Mailed on 7/10/2019. Answer Follow Up on 7/31/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit acceptance of service)(Carey, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, Ltd. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (bt)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (bt)
July 1, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-700-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (bt)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1832359 filed by Frank A. Fedele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Insurance Policy)(Carey, Robert) (Additional attachments added on 7/1/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (bt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedele v. Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lahey Clinic Insurance Company, Ltd
Represented By: Brian Andrew Suslak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank A. Fedele
Represented By: Robert S. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?